This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/21/2020 at 20:46:58 (UTC).

Ofelia Zamora vs. Diana Alles

Case Summary

On 01/30/2018 Ofelia Zamora filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Diana Alles. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Black, Donald, Diaz, Monica, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0380

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Black, Donald

Diaz, Monica

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zamora, Ofelia

Zamora, Ezequiel

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Alles, Diana

Stan Alles Trucking

Alles, Stan

SDA Enterprises

Alles, Stanley

SDA Transporation LLC

Alles, Stanley D, JR

Stan Alles Transport

Cross Plaintiff

Martinez, Jose Luis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yates, Joseph R.

Dreyer, Roger A

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Frankenberger, David J.

Schoenburg, Patrick S.

Antoniou, Alexi P

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Moe's POS-Stan Alles Transport.pdf; Comment: as to Stan Alles Transport

Notice Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees (02941903xAE610).pdf; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

Case Management Statement Filed

CMC Statement (02937767xAE610).pdf; Comment: 7/30/18 Case Management Statement

Summons issued and filed

Summons-Amended.pdf; Summons issued and filed; Comment: First Amended Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons-Amended.pdf; Summons issued and filed; Comment: First Amended Complaint

Amended Document Filed

Complaint-First Amended (02912920xAE610).pdf; Comment: First Amended Complaint filed.

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Comment: to file first amended complaint

Order Received for Signature

{Proposed} Order.pdf; Comment: Signed and returned to clerk's office for further processing Forwarded to Dept: 502 Order to: File First Amended Complaint

Stipulation Filed

Stip to File First Amended Complaint.pdf; Comment: to File First Amended Complaint

Notice Filed

Notice of Trial (03021874xAE610).pdf; Comment: Notice of Trial

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation ADR; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator:Justive Nickholas Dibiaso (Ret.)

Judgment

Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Alles, Stan; Alles, Diana; Martinez, Jose Luis; Comment: Without prejudice

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: to Amended Complaint

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: jury fee deposit.

Answer Filed

Answer to first amended complaint

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Zamora, Ofelia; Zamora, Ezequiel; Alles, Diana; Alles, Stan; Alles, Stan; Alles, Diana; Martinez, Jose Luis; Stan Alles Transport; Comment: with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Stan Alles Transport; Comment: Without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Alles, Stan; Alles, Diana; Martinez, Jose Luis; Comment: Without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names:; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • HearingCRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • HearingJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Jury requested by all parties; 5 to 10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • HearingTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingNotice of Settlement filed- Notice of Settlement.pdf; Comment: Treated as an Unconditional settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zamora, Ezequiel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-52626 Zamora, Ezequiel $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zamora, Ezequiel: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zamora, Ezequiel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-39688 Zamora, Ezequiel $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zamora, Ezequiel: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zamora, Ezequiel: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-08405 ZAMORA, EZEQUIEL $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zamora, Ezequiel: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Zamora, Ezequiel; Total Financial Assessment $665.00; Total Payments and Credits $665.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zamora, Ofelia: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2019-00009109 Zamora, Ofelia $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Zamora, Ofelia: Transaction Assessment $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • FinancialFinancial: Zamora, Ofelia; Total Financial Assessment $9.00; Total Payments and Credits $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

RECEIVED VIA EFILE

6/1/2018 9:56 AM . FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT By: C. York, Deputy

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF FRESNO

OFELIA ZAMORA and EZEQUIEL Case No.: 18CECGO00380 ZAMORA, individually and as Successor in Interest, | {PREOPOSED y ORDER TO FILE

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Plaintiffs, | /18CECG00380 . OF V., Order flled

SDA ENTERPRISES, DIANA ALLES, STAN ALLES, STANLEY ALLES, STAN ALLES TRUCKING, and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive,

Defendants.

ORDER

GOOD CAUSE HAVING BEEN SHOWN, and based on the Stipulation of all parties, th Court Orders Plaintiffs Leave to File a First Amended Complaint.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

DATED: fp-4—/ &

SUPERIOR COURT