This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 06:25:42 (UTC).

NGC Construction, Inc. vs. Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc./LEAD CASE

Case Summary

On 09/26/2016 NGC Construction, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc /LEAD CASE. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Cullers, Mark, Gaab, Kimberly and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3110

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Cullers, Mark

Gaab, Kimberly

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Mendoza, Julio

NGC Construction, Inc.

Tri-Manufacturing, Inc., a California Corporation

Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc., a California Corporation

Defendants

Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc.

Mendoza, Julio

Oehischlaeger, Heather

Oehischlaeger, Nate

Pineda-Jiminez, Jenny

NGC Drywall

NGC Construction, Inc

Gibson, Judy

Ramirez, Alain

Rekenthaler, Brian

Lopez, Joaquin

Contoriano, Oniber

Foam Design LLC, a Limited Liability Company

Reliable Building Supplies, Inc., a California Corporation

Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc. a California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Farley, Michael L.

Cuttone, Brian K.

Boyd-Farrell, Rhys C.

Casheros, Jerry D.

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: Declaration of Brian K. Cuttone in Support of Oppostion to the Motion to Quash Subpoenas

Opposition filed

Opposition; Comment: Opposition to Demurrer of Defendants Foam Design, Reliable Building Supplies, Inc and Brian Rekenthaler

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc., Nate Oehschlaeger, and Heather Oehschlaeger's Answer to Second Amended Complaint

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached.

Reply filed

Reply; Comment: Defendant's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Demurrer

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants' Demurrer

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service - Nate Oehischlaeger

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of the Demurrer of Defendants NGC Construction, Inc.;Foam Design, LLC: Reliable Building Supplies, Inc.; and Brian Rekenthaler

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice of Demurrer of Defendants NGC Construction, Inc.; Foam Design, LLC; Reliable Building Supplies, Inc.; and Brian Rekenthaler

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached.

Association of Attorney filed

Association of Attorney/Counsel; Comment: Notice of Association of Counsel

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury fee deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of tri valley; nate; heather

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: Forwarded to: 503 Order for: Consolidate Actions Forwarded to 4th floor clerk's office for further processing.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Strike

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC and Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2018
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing Pursuant to Rule 225 on August 13, 2018 at 1:00 PM in Conference Room 305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Conditional Settlement Reached- Notice; Comment: Projected Completion Date:June 15, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Denied- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: on request for pretrial discovery process. Clerk's certificate of mailing attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order filed- Order filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: Stipulation to STAY DISCOVERY between Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc. Nate Oehischlaeger, Heather Oehischlaeger and Defendant Judith Gibson - Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2016
  • Financial info for Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc. a California Corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-59496 Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc. a California Corporation $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Financial info for Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc. a California Corporation: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Financial: Tri-Valley Plastering, Inc. a California Corporation; Total Financial Assessment $665.00; Total Payments and Credits $665.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Financial info for NGC Construction, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-12326 NGC Construction, Inc. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Financial info for NGC Construction, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Financial info for NGC Construction, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-02017 NGC Construction, Inc. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Financial info for NGC Construction, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial info for NGC Construction, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-43220 NGC Construction, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial info for NGC Construction, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial: NGC Construction, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $645.00; Total Payments and Credits $645.00

    Read MoreRead Less