This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 06:57:55 (UTC).

Nationstar Mortgage, LLC vs. Manuel Porras

Case Summary

On 09/29/2016 Nationstar Mortgage, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Manuel Porras. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3153

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nationstar Mortgage, LLC

Defendants

Porras, Manuel G.

Pacheco, Antonio

De Paz Perez, Artemia

All Persons Unknown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Widener, Vanessa H.

 

Court Documents

Request for Court Judgment

Request for Court Judgment; Summary .pdf; Comment: Request for Court Judgment; Summary of Case; Declarations of Siggle Shaw, JR Vidales and Vanessa H. Widener

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Request for Default Received

5287-222 Default - All Persons Unknown.pdf; Comment: Without judgment- All Persons Unknown

Request for Default Received

5287-222 Default - Artenia De Paz Perez.pdf; Comment: Without judgment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Type of Document: Summons and Complaint by Publication in the Fresno Bee as to Antonio Pacheco - granted

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Type of Document: Summons and Complaint by Publication in the Fresno Bee as to All Persons unknown - granted

Civil case cover sheet

5287-222 Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached certificate of mailing

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10

Request for Judical Notice

RFJN .pdf

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

5287-222 Proof of Publication-03092017-090544.pdf; Comment: All defendants served by publication

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: Declaration of William B. Bergeron in Support of Application for Service by Publication of Antonio Pacheco.

Civil Complaint filed

5287-222 Complaint.pdf; Comment: Complaint for Quiet Title and Declaratory Relief

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC; Porras, Manuel G.; Pacheco, Antonio; De Paz Perez, Artemia; All Persons Unknown; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Nationstar Mortgage, LLC; Awarded Against:; Porras, Manuel G.; Pacheco, Antonio; De Paz Perez, Artemia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Default Hearing- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: William Burgen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)- Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Received- Proposed Default Judgment .pdf; Comment: PENDING HEARING - [Proposed] Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Court Judgment- Request for Court Judgment - form .pdf; Comment: Request for Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal .pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Judical Notice- RFJN .pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Court Judgment- Request for Court Judgment; Summary .pdf; Comment: Request for Court Judgment; Summary of Case; Declarations of Siggle Shaw, JR Vidales and Vanessa H. Widener

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Order Received for Signature; Comment: Order signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing Forwarded to Dept:501 on 12/30/16 Order for: Publication and Posting of Summons on Artemia De Paz Perez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- 5287-222 Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- 5287-222 Summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- 5287-222 Complaint.pdf; Comment: Complaint for Quiet Title and Declaratory Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Financial info for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-59372 Nationstar Mortgage, LLC $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Financial info for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC: Transaction Assessment $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Financial info for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-43740 Nationstar Mortgage, LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Financial info for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Financial: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $515.00; Total Payments and Credits $515.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.