This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 06:14:21 (UTC).

Nathaniel Dill, III vs. Adrienne Gray

Case Summary

On 09/23/2016 Nathaniel Dill, III filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Adrienne Gray. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Gamoian, Lisa and Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7613

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Gamoian, Lisa

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dill, Nathaniel, III

Defendant

Gray, Adrienne Michelle

Other

ALL OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Coronado, Louie

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Dill, Nathaniel, III; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against:; Gray, Adrienne Michelle; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $3,080.00; Holdover Damages: $1,217.00; Attorney Fees: $500.00; Costs: $445.00; Total: $5,242.00

Judgment

Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Dill, Nathaniel, III; Gray, Adrienne Michelle; ALL OCCUPANTS; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Dill, Nathaniel, III; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 1917 S. Maple Ave. Fresno, CA 93702; Awarded Against:; Gray, Adrienne Michelle

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly satisfied as to possession only

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Premises Only

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Adrienne Michelle Gray

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: Notice of UDDI

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Money Damages After "Judgment-Restitution of Premises"; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Dill, Nathaniel, III; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against:; Gray, Adrienne Michelle; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $3,080.00; Holdover Damages: $1,217.00; Attorney Fees: $500.00; Costs: $445.00; Total: $5,242.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Dill, Nathaniel, III; Gray, Adrienne Michelle; ALL OCCUPANTS; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Dill, Nathaniel, III; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 1917 S. Maple Ave. Fresno, CA 93702; Awarded Against:; Gray, Adrienne Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly satisfied as to possession only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Premises Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default- Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Request for Default Received- Comment: With Judgment Box #29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: Notice of UDDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified- Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Financial info for Dill, Nathaniel, III: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00036284 Coronado, Louie $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Financial info for Dill, Nathaniel, III: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • Financial info for Dill, Nathaniel, III: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00032632 Coronado, Louie $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • Financial info for Dill, Nathaniel, III: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • Financial: Dill, Nathaniel, III; Total Financial Assessment $265.00; Total Payments and Credits $265.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.