This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/08/2019 at 15:18:09 (UTC).

Naomi Saelee-Casado vs Javier Casado Ramos

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 Naomi Saelee-Casado filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Javier Casado Ramos. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kalemkarian, David, Tharpe, D Tyler and Diaz, Monica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3331

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kalemkarian, David

Tharpe, D Tyler

Diaz, Monica

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Saelee-Casado, Naomi

Respondent

Casado Ramos, Javier

Minors

Saelee-Casado, Sophia Marie

Saelee-Casado, Noah Kao

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Soley, Leslie A

Respondent Attorney

Jones, Julie C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • Hearing2 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • HearingDocuments sent to- Comment: E file tickler NEJ w/envelopes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • HearingJudge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached- Comment: HRG: 8/6/2019 Judicial Officer: D. Kalemkarian Dept: 202 Clerk: L. Garvin Bailiff: A. Rivera Court Reporter: R. Lundy Time: 9:21 am Petitioner not present Respondent not present/Jones Continued to: Next family centered case conference Date: 2/4/20 Time: 08:30 a.m Dept: 202 Parties are working on case. Matter continued for further case status conference. Attorney Jones to notify opposing party.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Hearing2 Family - Centered Status Conference- Original Type: 2 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Respondent; Parties Present- Attorney: Jones, Julie C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • HearingJudge McGuire Minute Order. See attached.- Comment: Dept 203 11:13am Judge: R McGuire Clerk: V Carbajal Reporter: J Magallanes Petitioner: present/ Counsel: L Soley Respondent: present/ Counsel: J Jones hrg type: Review- CC/CV Other: Respondent is not present. Attorney Jones states that she has authority to enter into a stipulation on Respondent's behalf. Parties have reached an agreement. Parties agree that the agreement shall be by Minute Order only. Parties agree that each parent is to notify the other if children are sick as soon as possible via Our Family Wizard. Our Family Wizard shall be the sole means of communication between the parties regarding the children. Parties are to respond to messages in Our Family Wizard immediately, and no later than 24 hours. If a child is sick or absent, the custodial parent shall be responsible to contact the school and address the absence. Parties listed the home for sale, and an offer has been accepted. Parties shall receive $1500.00 and shall divide it equally. Both parties are ordered to sign all necessary escrow documents and shall have all items removed from the home no later than 7/3/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • HearingReview- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: CC/CV; Parties Present- Petitioner: Saelee-Casado, Naomi; Parties Present- Attorney: Soley, Leslie A; Parties Present- Respondent: Casado Ramos, Javier; Parties Present- Attorney: Jones, Julie C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • HearingNotice Filed- Comment: Notice of Non Availability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • HearingJudge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached- Comment: Clerk: L. Garvin Court Reporter: R. Lundy Bailiff: A. Rivera Petitioner not present Respondent not present Attorney present: Jones Continued to: Next family centered case conference Date: 8/6/19 Time: 10:30 a.m. Dept.: 202 Other: Settlement proposals have been submitted. Parties are working on case. Matter continued for further case status conference. Attorney Jones to notify opposing party.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Hearing1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Respondent; Parties Present- Attorney: Jones, Julie C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • HearingProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • HearingUniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • HearingPetition for Dissolution with Children- Comment: Summons issued yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Casado Ramos, Javier: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-48623 Casado Ramos, Javier $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Casado Ramos, Javier: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Casado Ramos, Javier; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Saelee-Casado, Naomi: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-89218 Saelee-Casado, Naomi $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Saelee-Casado, Naomi: Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Saelee-Casado, Naomi: Counter Payment Receipt # FAM-2018-00008060 Saelee-Casado, Naomi $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Saelee-Casado, Naomi: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Saelee-Casado, Naomi; Total Financial Assessment $525.00; Total Payments and Credits $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.