This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 16:49:48 (UTC).

Moonlight Freightway, Inc. vs. JFS Express, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/15/2016 Moonlight Freightway, Inc filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against JFS Express, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4026

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Moonlight Freightway, Inc.

Sandhu, Gurninder Singh

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Sidhu, Harpreet

Wilkins Drolshagen & Czenshinski LLP

JFS Express, Inc.

Sidhu, Hardeep

Global Hawk Insurance Company

Golden Hawk Insurance Brokerage, Inc.

Global Century Insurance Brokers, Inc.

Thandi, Jasbir Singh

Thandi Inusrance Brokerage

Global Hawk Insurance Company(RRG)

JFS Freight Inc., a California cormporation

Cross Plaintiffs

Sandu, Gurninder Singh

Moonlight Freightway, Inc. a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dhanjan, Sarwinder Singh

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Cowin, William L.

Connely, Mark B.

Flamiano, Dominic G

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Vasquez, George J.

 

Court Documents

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: ruling on Demurrer and Motion to Strike

Demand for Jury Trial filed

Demand for Jury Trial; Comment: Jury Demand and Post Fee in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of plaintiffs

Opposition filed

Opposition; Comment: Memo of P&A to Opposition to Motion to Strike

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: POS Hardeep

Motion filed

Motion; Comment: Defendant Wilkins, Drolshagen & Czeshinski's Notice of Motion & Motion to Dismiss

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: POS, Wilkins

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration in Support of Opposition to Anti-Slapp

Request for Judical Notice

Request for Judical Notice

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: re: Demurrer, Motion Strike (x2)

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only); Comment: re: Mtn to Strike, Demurrer, Strike

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: costs in favor of Defendant

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: POS Jasbir

Judgment

Summary Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Summary Judgment Entered; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Thandi, Jasbir Singh; Global Hawk Insurance Company(RRG); Golden Hawk Insurance Brokerage, Inc.; Global Century Insurance Brokers, Inc.; Awarded Against:; Moonlight Freightway, Inc.; Sandhu, Gurninder Singh

Notice of Motion

Motion; Comment: and Motion to: Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint.

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: Corrected Judgment signed and issued. Forwarded to clerks office 12/12/2017, for further processing. CORRECTED [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEF WILKINS, DROLSHAGEN & CZESHINSKI

Reply filed

Reply; Comment: Def Wilkins' Reply to Opp to Special Motion to Strike

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment After Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Judgment After Court Trial; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Wilkins Drolshagen & Czenshinski LLP; Judgment Amount: $526.06; Awarded Against:; Moonlight Freightway, Inc.; Sandhu, Gurninder Singh; Amount; Comment: Judgment on costs added 1/8/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment After Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Judgment After Court Trial; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Wilkins Drolshagen & Czenshinski LLP; Awarded Against:; Moonlight Freightway, Inc.; Sandhu, Gurninder Singh; Comment: costs to be determined and awarded pursuant to the submission of Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Summary Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Summary Judgment Entered; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Thandi, Jasbir Singh; Global Hawk Insurance Company(RRG); Golden Hawk Insurance Brokerage, Inc.; Global Century Insurance Brokers, Inc.; Awarded Against:; Moonlight Freightway, Inc.; Sandhu, Gurninder Singh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Wilkins Drolshagen & Czenshinski LLP; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 5-7 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Costs added to Judgment- Comment: $526.06 per Judgment of Costs signed 1/8/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order filed- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: costs in favor of Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
123 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2017
  • Financial info for Thandi, Jasbir Singh: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Financial: Thandi, Jasbir Singh; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Financial info for JFS Express, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2017-01715 Sidhu, Hardeep $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Financial info for JFS Express, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Financial: JFS Express, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Financial info for Moonlight Freightway, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-32156 Moonlight Freightway, Inc. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Financial info for Moonlight Freightway, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Financial info for Moonlight Freightway, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-57799 Moonlight Freightway, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Financial info for Moonlight Freightway, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Financial: Moonlight Freightway, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.