This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:19:43 (UTC).

Moe Moallem vs. Kevin D. DeFehr/UD

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Moe Moallem filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Kevin D DeFehr/UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1521

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Moallem, Moe

Badizadegan, Mehri

Defendants

De Fehr, Kevin D

De Fehr, Roberta M

De Fehr, Kehlani B

Other

All Other Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Moallem, Moe

Badizadegan, Mehri

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • Writ filed satisfied poss only- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. mk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE328554.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. ed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Matter taken off calendar for 02/24/2014. Judgment entered sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • Restitution of premises jgm- Comment: Judgment entered pursuant to CCP 1169 for plaintiff(s) Moe Moallem ; Mehri Badizadegan against defendant(s) Kevin D De Fehr ; Kehlani B De Fehr ; Roberta M De Fehr on for restitution of the premises only. 6375 N Wilson, Fresno CA 93704. sr (copies in tickler M)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Kevin D De Fehr ; Kehlani B De Fehr ; Roberta M De Fehr sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe 1 - 10 ONLY defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. sr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/jugment red runner tag box 2 ed

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2013
  • App for publication of summons- Comment: Order for service of Summons by Posting of Summons for Kevin D. DeFehr; Roberta M. DeFehr; B DeFehr; Kelani B. DeFehr, signed by Judge Peterson on 12/26/2013. sef

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt CLCE324919.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • App for Publication of Summons- Comment: Order for service of Summons by Posting Publication signed by Judge on . hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAPRTY on 17-DEC-2013 by KCLUGSTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCE323994.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 MM Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by MMEZA.

    Read MoreRead Less