This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 13:22:13 (UTC).

Mitesh Gajjar vs. Lisa Garabadian

Case Summary

On 11/18/2016 Mitesh Gajjar filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Lisa Garabadian. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale and Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9252

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gajjar, Mitesh

Defendants

Garabadian, Lisa

Garabadian, Ruth Lisa

West, Chad Jeffrey

Other

All Occupants

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Judgment - Restitution of Premises; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Judgment Type: Judgment - Restitution of Premises; Party Names: Gajjar, Mitesh; Garabadian, Lisa; All Occupants; West, Chad Jeffrey; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Gajjar, Mitesh; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 1415 W. Olive Avenue, Room 256 Fresno, CA 93728; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against:; Garabadian, Lisa; West, Chad Jeffrey; Comment: LOCKOUT STAYED TO 1/10/17

Stipulation and Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: All Unknown Occupants

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

At Issue Memorandum

At Issue Memorandum

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: All Unknown Occupants

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Lisa Garabadian

Answer Filed

Answer Filed

Answer Filed

Answer Filed

Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession filed

Civil Document; Comment: Chad Jeffrey West

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed; Comment: by Deputy Clerk

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed; Comment: by Deputy Clerk

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: UDDI Dismissal

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment - Restitution of Premises; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Judgment Type: Judgment - Restitution of Premises; Party Names: Gajjar, Mitesh; Garabadian, Lisa; All Occupants; West, Chad Jeffrey; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Gajjar, Mitesh; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 1415 W. Olive Avenue, Room 256 Fresno, CA 93728; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against:; Garabadian, Lisa; West, Chad Jeffrey; Comment: LOCKOUT STAYED TO 1/10/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order filed- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Unlawful Detainer Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Proof of Service of Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: RE: All Unknown Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • At Issue Memorandum- At Issue Memorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • At Issue Memorandum Received

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2016
  • Financial info for West, Chad Jeffrey: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Financial: West, Chad Jeffrey; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Financial info for Garabadian, Lisa: Fee Waiver $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Financial info for Garabadian, Lisa: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Financial info for Garabadian, Lisa: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00038670 Garabadian, Lisa $0.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Financial info for Garabadian, Lisa: Transaction Assessment $0.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Financial: Garabadian, Lisa; Total Financial Assessment $225.60; Total Payments and Credits $225.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Financial info for Gajjar, Mitesh: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00038348 Akshar, INC $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Financial info for Gajjar, Mitesh: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Financial: Gajjar, Mitesh; Total Financial Assessment $240.00; Total Payments and Credits $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.