This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 13:14:24 (UTC).

Misty Fini Schultz Atkins vs. Sequoia Brewing Company

Case Summary

On 02/14/2017 Misty Fini Schultz Atkins filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sequoia Brewing Company. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y., Diaz, Monica, Snauffer, Mark, Simpson, Alan and Black, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0496

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Diaz, Monica

Snauffer, Mark

Simpson, Alan

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs

Sequoia Brewing Company

Fini Schultz Atkins, Misty Nicole

Atkins, Kenneth

NMSBPCSLDHB, a California Limited Partnership

Granum Partners

All Commercial Landscape Service

All Commercial Landscaping Service

Granum Partners, a California Limited Partnership

NMSBPCSLDHB a California Limited Partnership

All Commercial Landscape Services

All Commercial Landscaping

Cross Defendants

NMSBPCSLDHB a California Limited Parnership

Granum Parnters, a California Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

Knudtson, Gigi M.

Harralson, Daniel L.

Decker, Jason A.

Sager, Kristina L

Jacobsen, Karen L

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Decker, Jason A.

 

Court Documents

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Answer Filed

Answer to Cross-Complaint; Comment: to 3rd Cross-Complaint

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: All Commercial Landscaping; Comment: With Prejudice

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: to 1st Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Notice and Acknowlegment of Receipt - Civl

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator:James A. Dilling

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross-Complaint - Sequoia.pdf; Comment: of Sequoia Brewing Co.

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Atkins, Kenneth; Comment: With Prejudice

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: Answer to Sequoia's Cross-Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: on Cross-Complaint

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: All Commercial Landscaping Service

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: To 1st Cross-Complaint

Amendment filed

Amendment to Complaint; Comment: Plaintiff's Amendment to Complaint Naming Defendant DOE 1

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Fini Schultz Atkins, Misty Nicole; Sequoia Brewing Company; Atkins, Kenneth; NMSBPCSLDHB, a California Limited Partnership; Granum Partners; NMSBPCSLDHB a California Limited Parnership; Granum Parnters, a California Limited Partnership; All Commercial Landscaping; Sequoia Brewing Company; All Commercial Landscape Service; Sequoia Brewing Company; NMSBPCSLDHB a California Limited Partnership; Granum Partners, a California Limited Partnership; All Commercial Landscaping Service; All Commercial Landscape Services; NMSBPCSLDHB, a California Limited Partnership; Granum Partners, a California Limited Partnership; Sequoia Brewing Company; Comment: without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Sequoia Brewing Company; NMSBPCSLDHB a California Limited Partnership; Granum Partners, a California Limited Partnership; All Commercial Landscaping Service; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment: (As to 2nd Cross-Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: NMSBPCSLDHB a California Limited Parnership; Granum Parnters, a California Limited Partnership; All Commercial Landscaping; Sequoia Brewing Company; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: All Commercial Landscape Services; NMSBPCSLDHB, a California Limited Partnership; Granum Partners, a California Limited Partnership; Sequoia Brewing Company; Comment: cross complaint of All Commercial Landscape Service with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: All Commercial Landscaping; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: All Commercial Landscape Service; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: All Commercial Landscaping Service; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment: (As to Defendant in 2nd Cross-Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Atkins, Kenneth; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: requested by Defendants with estimated time of 5-7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2017
  • Financial info for NMSBPCSLDHB, a California Limited Partnership: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Financial info for NMSBPCSLDHB, a California Limited Partnership: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2017-01416 Granum Partners $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Financial info for NMSBPCSLDHB, a California Limited Partnership: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Financial: NMSBPCSLDHB, a California Limited Partnership; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Financial info for Sequoia Brewing Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-49905 Sequoia Brewing Company $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Financial info for Sequoia Brewing Company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Financial: Sequoia Brewing Company; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Financial info for Fini Schultz Atkins, Misty Nicole: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-08534 Fini Schultz Atkins, Misty Nicole $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Financial info for Fini Schultz Atkins, Misty Nicole: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Financial: Fini Schultz Atkins, Misty Nicole; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.