This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:23:13 (UTC).

Miguel Moreno v Daniel Wetzel et al/DISMISSED

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Miguel Moreno filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Daniel Wetzel /DISMISSED. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2371

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moreno, Miguel

San Jose, CA 95127

Defendants

Wetzel, Daniel

Clovis, CA 93612

Evans, Amy

Clovis, CA 93612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal SC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Court Trial- Original Type: Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Hearing Time: 08:45 AM; Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • Request for Dismissal SC- Comment: Request for Dismissal Small Claims without prejudice mt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • Pltf's claim served- Comment: Plaintiff's claim returned to court sub-served as to John Doe, Apparently in Charge and filed. Cost $40.00. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • Pltf's claim served- Comment: Plaintiff's claim returned to court sub-served as to John Doe, Apparently in charge and filed. Cost $118.12. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt SCCE67210.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Pltf's claim personal service- Comment: Plaintiff's claim given to plaintiff for personal service . process server cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Pltfs claim and order filed- Comment: Plaintiff's Claim and Order filed. Matter set for court trial on 2/11/14 at 8:45 am in Dept # 97E. cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less