This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 22:43:28 (UTC).

Miguel Garcia vs. Maria Godinez

Case Summary

On 01/11/2018 Miguel Garcia filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Maria Godinez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, Donald, Simpson, Alan, Gaab, Kimberly and Diaz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0228

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gaab, Kimberly

Black, Donald

Simpson, Alan

Diaz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Garcia, Miguel A

Area Remodeling and Construction

Defendant

Godinez, Maria Guadalupe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chappars, Mike

Defendant Attorney

Nevels, Brook B.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

05/07/2018: Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Trial Readiness

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Old Attorney: Pro Per New Attorney: Mike Chappars

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Notice Filed

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Notice Filed

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint - Notice

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: for Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint

Minute Order Attachment

01/06/2020: Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

12/17/2019: Minute Order Attachment

Request for Dismissal

12/10/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/27/2019: Request for Dismissal

Dismissal Not Entered

11/27/2019: Dismissal Not Entered

Minute Order Attachment

08/23/2019: Minute Order Attachment

Consent to Confer filed

08/23/2019: Consent to Confer filed

Minute Order Attachment

08/23/2019: Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

08/06/2019: Minute Order Attachment

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketSettled Case Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: from Chambers and Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment; Comment: and Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSettled Case Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: Set from TRR Settlement 8/23/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party; Names: Garcia, Miguel A; Godinez, Maria Guadalupe; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment; Comment: (as to Original Complaint ONLY.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Clerk unable to dismiss entire action as requested. Cross complaint still pending.

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Unserved; Comment: Defective Proof: Multiple parties listed on line 3. Defendant's name must match name on Complaint. On #7(b) address of person who served papers is incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: RE: Maria Guadalupe, Godinez, Does; 1-100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Garcia, Miguel A: Fee Waiver $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Garcia, Miguel A: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Garcia, Miguel A; Total Financial Assessment $430.00; Total Payments and Credits $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed; Comment: by deputy clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Lenden F. Webb (SBN 236377)

Brooked B. Nevels (SBN 302994) E-FILED WEBB LAW GROUP, APC 466 W . Fallbrook Ave. Suite 102 5/29/2018 1:34 PM Fresno, CA 93711 Telephone: (559) 431-4888 FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT Facsimile: (559) 821-4500 . Email: LWebb@ WBLawGroup.com By: C. Balleza, Deputy

Email: BNevels@WBLawGroup.com

Attorney for Defendant,

MARIA GUADALUPE GODINEZ

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF FRESNO

CIVIL LIMITED DIVISION

MIGUEL A GARCIA, PRO SE CASE NO.: 18CECL00228

AREA REMODELING AND CONSTRUCTION NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITIONTO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR LEAVE T

Plaintiff, FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT VS. DATE: June 6, 2018 i G MARIA GUADALUPE GODINEZ, and : . DOES 1-100, inclusive, JUDGE: Hon. Judge Diaz Defendants.

NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN that neither Defendant Maria Guadalupe G odinez nor her attorneys, Lenden F. Webb and Brooke B. Nevels of the law firm of Webb Law Group APC, have received any opposition papers to Defendant’s Motion for Leave to File a Cross- Complaint. Plaintiff was served with the aforementioned motion via U.S. Mail on April 5, 2018 (a true and correct copy of the proof of service related to Defendant’s Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint is attached hereto as “Exhibit 1”).

This Motion is scheduled for hearing on June 6, 2008 at 1:30PM. A's such, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 1005(b), the deadline for filing and serving any opposition to the Motion was May 23, 2018.

This Motion is scheduled for hearing on June 6, 2008 at 1:30PM. A's such, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 1005(b), the deadline for filing and serving any opposition to the Motion was May 23, 2018. A's of the filing of this notice, counsel for Defendant has not been served with any opposition to the Motion. Additionally, the docket does not show that any opposition has been filed. “Failure to oppose a motion that is duly noticed and brought on for hearing in [an] action makes the motion itself an uncontested proceedings.” Rooney v. Vermont Inv. Corp., 10 Cal. 3d

A's of the filing of this notice, counsel for Defendant has not been served with any opposition to the Motion. Additionally, the docket does not show that any opposition has been filed. “Failure to oppose a motion that is duly noticed and brought on for hearing in [an] action makes the motion itself an uncontested proceedings.” Rooney v. Vermont Inv. Corp., 10 Cal. 3d

Dated: May 29, 2018 WEBB LAW GROUP, APC

LENDEN F. WEBB BROOKE B. NEVELS Attorneys for D efendant

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Area Remodeling and Construction is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nevels, Brook B.