This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 02:35:33 (UTC).

Midland Funding VS Joel Torres/CCR

Case Summary

On 06/06/2011 Midland Funding filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Joel Torres/CCR. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Reedley Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0262

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding, LLC

Defendant

Torres, Joel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harris, Stelios A.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $1012.00 Interest: $ 1678.64

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $1,012.00 Interest: $1,693.80

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Orange Amount: $4,215.72

Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

Memorandum of Costs

07/23/2018: Memorandum of Costs

Memorandum of Costs

11/19/2018: Memorandum of Costs

Writ of Execution Issued

11/21/2018: Writ of Execution Issued

Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

05/28/2019: Writ Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit Filed- Wholly Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Funding, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-85426 Midland Funding, LLC $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Funding, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Midland Funding, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Orange Amount: $4,215.72

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $1,012.00 Interest: $1,693.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $1012.00 Interest: $ 1678.64

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • DocketClerk's default judgment; Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 12/12/11 for plaintiff(s) Midland Funding, LLC against defendant(s) Joel Torres in the sum of: Principal: $2,747.62 Interest: $ 512.30 Atty Fees: $ 0.00 Costs: $ 249.00 Total: $3,508.92 jp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • DocketCourt orders; Comment: Proposed Order Granting Use of Copies in Lieu of Originals signed by Judge James A. Kelley. jp.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2011
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default filed; Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Joel Torres. jp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2011
  • DocketDeclaration filed; Comment: Declaration of due diligence filed. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2011
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp - subst.; Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Rosalia Franco, Co- Occupant, mailed on 06/20/11 . lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • DocketChange of address; Comment: Notice of change of address of Midland Funding, LLC, effective 06/10/11. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketDeclaration filed; Comment: Declaration of Venue filed. jp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLRE13727.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. jp Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketSummons filed; Comment: Summons on Collections Complaint filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketDecl for Reduction of Fee; Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRIS STELIOS A.