This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/01/2018 at 04:53:54 (UTC).

Midland Funding vs. Coleman/CC

Case Summary

On 04/18/2012 Midland Funding filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Coleman/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0426

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding, LLC

Defendant

Coleman, Caroll

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harris, Stelios A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Order filed- Comment: Order granting use of copies in lieu of originals signed by Judge Cabrera filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 2/21/13 for plaintiff MIdlan Funding LLC against defendant Caroll Coleman in the sum of: Principal: $4,264.11 Interest: $ 1,163.48 Atty Fees: $ 0.00 Costs: $ 317.00 Total: $5,744.59 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: with judgment. lc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Caroll Coleman hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration re: code of civil procedure 1033; interest; and evidence code 1550 filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • Affidavit filed- Comment: Affidavit in support of default judgment pursuant to code of civil procedure 585 filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on John Banias co occupant, mailed on 10/31/12 hf .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration diligence filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration diligence filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCL38669.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Collections Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of venue filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of reduced filing fee filed lmi.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. lmi Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less