This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/16/2022 at 04:20:45 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. Javier Musquiz

Case Summary

On 06/26/2017 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Javier Musquiz. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Diaz, Monica, Pebet, Noelle and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4997

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Diaz, Monica

Tharpe, D Tyler

Pebet, Noelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendants

Musquiz, Javier J.

Musquiz, Javier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Snyder, David B.

Nguyen, Huan T.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Pebet

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Pebet; Comment: by plaintiff

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Comment: RE: Collections Case Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Sent on: 11/08/2018

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: re: code of civil procedure; interest; and evidence code

Declaration of Reduced Filing Fee Filed

Declaration

Dismissal Not Entered

Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Page 2 is incomplete and #2 is incorrect.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Javier Musquiz

Minute Order Attachment

06/05/2019: Minute Order Attachment

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Pebet

06/05/2019: Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Pebet

Minute Order Attachment

03/27/2019: Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

02/22/2019: Minute Order Attachment

Order to Show Cause

11/08/2018: Order to Show Cause

Dismissal Not Entered

10/18/2017: Dismissal Not Entered

Request to Enter Default Denied

10/18/2017: Request to Enter Default Denied

Declaration

10/18/2017: Declaration

Declaration

10/18/2017: Declaration

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party; Names: Midland Funding LLC; Musquiz, Javier; Comment: Without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiled Stipulation for Commissioner Pebet; Comment: by plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Time est. 1-2 hrs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketOSC - 3.740 Collection Case Dispo; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:40 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Comment: RE: Collections Case Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Sent on: 11/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Page 2 is incomplete and #2 is incorrect.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 07/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Javier Musquiz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Funding LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-33025 Midland Funding LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Funding LLC: Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • FinancialFinancial: Midland Funding LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Reduced Filing Fee Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: CCP Section 395 (b) Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JPMORGAN LEGAL DEPARTMENT - HUAN TIEN NGUYEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER, DAVID B.