This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/16/2022 at 07:02:50 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLCvs.Frank Zavala, JR

Case Summary

On 07/07/2017 Midland Funding LLCvs Frank Zavala, JR was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5440

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Zavala, Frank, JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Snyder, David B.

Nguyen, Huan T.

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Regarding Code of Civil Procedure 1033

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Exhibits in Support of Judgement

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: With Judgment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: amended proof of service of summons; Frank Zavalz JR

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Statement filed

Statement of Classification and Location/Venue

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

11/21/2017: Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Request to Enter Default

11/21/2017: Request to Enter Default

Declaration

11/21/2017: Declaration

Request for Dismissal of Does and Roes

11/21/2017: Request for Dismissal of Does and Roes

Declaration

11/21/2017: Declaration

Judgment

11/21/2017: Judgment

Request for Entry of Default

11/21/2017: Request for Entry of Default

Proof of Service

08/22/2017: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

07/28/2017: Proof of Service

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names: Midland Funding LLC; Zavala, Frank, JR; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Midland Funding LLC; Awarded Against; Zavala, Frank, JR; Amount; Damages: $1,283.17; Costs: $249.00; Total: $1532.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Exhibits in Support of Judgement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: Regarding Code of Civil Procedure 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Received; Comment: Pending Review; Forward to: 404 on 12/29/17****Returned to clerks office for processing****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default Received; Comment: With Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: amended proof of service of summons; Frank Zavalz JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Frank Zavala - DEFECTIVE PROOF - The named party in this action is Frank Zavala Jr / POS states Frank Zavala

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Funding LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-35753 Midland Funding LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Funding LLC: Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • FinancialFinancial: Midland Funding LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: RE: Reduction in Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JPMORGAN LEGAL DEPARTMENT - HUAN TIEN NGUYEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER, DAVID B.