This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/14/2021 at 13:54:31 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs Philip Flores/CC

Case Summary

On 12/08/2014 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Philip Flores/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0070

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Flores, Philip

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Snyder, David B.

Midland Funding Llc 10601G Tierrasanta Blvd #4540

San Diego, CA 32134

Nguyen, Huan T.

 

Court Documents

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: re: CCP 1033; Interest; and Evidence Code 1550

Affidavit

Affidavit; Comment: C.C.P. 585

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: Exhibits in support of judgment

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: Judicial Notice re: C.C. 1788.50-1788.62

Dismissal Not Entered

Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Previously entered 4-30-15

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: C.C.P. 1033 and Evidence Code 1550

Judgment

Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Midland Funding LLC; Flores, Philip; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Midland Funding LLC; Awarded Against:; Flores, Philip; Amount; Damages: $2,160.50; Costs: $246.00; Total: $2406.50

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Funding LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-50262 Midland Funding LLC $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Funding LLC: Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno | Amount: $2,446.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed- Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Funding LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-61666 Midland Funding LLC $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Funding LLC: Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Midland Funding LLC; Total Financial Assessment $80.00; Total Payments and Credits $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $2,446.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed- Notice of Change of Address; Comment: Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice of Disassociation of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Jane Doe (Sibling/Co-resident, refused to give name) on 12/30/14, mailed on 12/31/14. BED 01/15/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketDeclaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Reasonable Diligence filed. BED 01/15/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • DocketPayment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE349371.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • DocketSummons filed- Comment: Summons on Civil Complaint filed. BED 12/10/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • DocketJBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. BED 12/10/14 Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Comment: Declaration of Venue BED 12/10/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • DocketDecl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. BED 12/10/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. BED 12/10/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: BED 12/10/14 Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JPMORGAN LEGAL DEPARTMENT - HUAN TIEN NGUYEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER, DAVID B.