This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/15/2021 at 17:40:16 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. Jesse Villegas/CC/DI

Case Summary

On 12/04/2014 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jesse Villegas/CC/DI. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale and Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9965

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MidlandFunding LLC

Defendant

Villegas, Jesse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Snyder, David B.

Midland Funding Llc 10601G Tierrasanta Blvd #4540

San Diego, CA 32134

Nguyen, Huan T.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to: vacate dismissal

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Judgment

Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; MidlandFunding LLC; Awarded Against:; Villegas, Jesse; Amount; Damages: $2,161.40; Costs: $249.00; Total: $2410.40

Letter Received

Letter Received

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter Received- Letter Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; MidlandFunding LLC; Awarded Against:; Villegas, Jesse; Amount; Damages: $2,161.40; Costs: $249.00; Total: $2410.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketOrder Setting Aside Dismissal- Comment: Granted: See scanned order attached to the Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketMotion - Set Aside Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Villegas, Jesse: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00004055 MidlandFunding LLC $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Villegas, Jesse: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketMotion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion- Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to: vacate dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2015
  • DocketStipulation for judgment- Comment: Stipulation for settlement pursuant to California code of civil. JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • DocketDeclaration filed- Comment: Declaration of diligence filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service onKeren Becerra on 12/10/14 and mailed on 12/10/14 lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketJBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketPayment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE349103.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketDeclaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Venue filed. MB 12/4/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. MB 12/4/14 Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketDecl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. MB 12/4/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. MB 12/4/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: MB 12/4/14 Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDLANDFUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JPMORGAN LEGAL DEPARTMENT - HUAN TIEN NGUYEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER, DAVID B.