This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/13/2021 at 14:55:16 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs. Beatrice Valle/CC

Case Summary

On 12/04/2014 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Beatrice Valle/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9971

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Valle, Beatrice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Snyder, David B.

Nguyen, Huan T.

 

Court Documents

Affidavit

Affidavit; Comment: Re: Default Judgment CCP 585

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: Re: CCP 1033; Interest; Evidence code 1550

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10 only

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Debt Buyer after 1/1/2014; Request Court Judgment

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judicial Officer: CONVERSION, JUDGE; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Valle, Beatrice; Midland Funding LLC; Comment: without prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judicial Officer: CONVERSION, JUDGE; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Valle, Beatrice; Midland Funding LLC; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Debt Buyer after 1/1/2014; Request Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default- Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDismissal of Doe Defendant(s)- Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1-10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration Filed; Comment: Re: CCP 1033; Interest; Evidence code 1550

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit- Affidavit; Comment: Re: Default Judgment CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • DocketRequest for Default Received- Comment: Request for Entry of Default, Clerk's Judgment With Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • DocketDeclaration filed- Comment: Declaration of diligence filed. mn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Dorian Bourgeois co occupant on 01-28-15, mailed on 01-29-15 . mn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketJBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketPayment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCE349108.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketDeclaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Venue filed. MB 12/4/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. MB 12/4/14 Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketDecl for Reduction of Fee- Comment: Declaration for Reduction of Filing Fee filed by Plaintiff. MB 12/4/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. MB 12/4/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: MB 12/4/14 Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JPMORGAN LEGAL DEPARTMENT - HUAN TIEN NGUYEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER, DAVID B.