This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 13:44:43 (UTC).

Midland Funding, LLC v Louie Soriano/JU

Case Summary

On 09/07/2011 Midland Funding, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Louie Soriano/JU. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1070

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding, LLC

Defendant

Soriano, Louie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Snyder, David B.

Nguyen, Huan T.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $6,574.20

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: San Mateo Amount: $17,050.37

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Los Angeles Amount: $19,956.57

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $25.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $9,440.40

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Full

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment in Full filed- Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Funding, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2021-36487 Midland Funding, LLC $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Funding, LLC: Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed- Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Costs: $25.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $9,440.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Los Angeles Amount: $19,956.57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address Filed- Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Funding, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-85434 Midland Funding, LLC $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Midland Funding, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Midland Funding, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $65.00; Total Payments and Credits $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants 1-10 filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketAffidavit filed- Comment: Affidavit in support of default judgment pursuant to code of civil procedure 585 filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Louie Soriano. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • DocketPOS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Louie Soriano on 9-10-11 psn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • DocketJBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • DocketDeclaration filed- Comment: Declaration of venue filed. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • DocketPayment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCL36138.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • DocketZ_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JPMORGAN LEGAL DEPARTMENT - HUAN TIEN NGUYEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER, DAVID B.