This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/01/2018 at 09:11:49 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC v Jose Rivas /DIS

Case Summary

On 05/23/2012 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jose Rivas /DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0572

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Midland Funding LLC

Midland Funding, LLC

Defendant

Rivas, Jose

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brachfeld, Erica L.

Defendant Attorney

Rivas, Jose G.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. mn Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Jose Rivas on 5/29/12. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Order granting waiver of fees- Comment: Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by Clerk filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Answer filed- Comment: Answer to Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. lmi Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of service by mail filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Court Fees Waived- Comment: $225.00 (Amount of fees waived for documents filed or services provided) Specify: Answer to Complaint lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Jurisdictional Facts filed. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration re: Request for reduction in filing fees pursuant to CA Business and Professions code sec 6322.1(c)(1) filed. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCL39124.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. cm Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less