Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/27/2018 at 02:06:13 (UTC).

Midland Dunfind, LLC vs. Rebecca Howe

Case Summary

On 08/29/2011 Midland Dunfind, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rebecca Howe. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1028

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding, LLC

Defendant

Howe, Rebecca

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hunt, Michael S

 

Court Documents

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Writ of Execution filed wholly unsatisfied

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Writ of Execution filed wholly unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $2,001.24

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $ 0 Credit: $ 0 Interest: $ 510.10

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Interest is to high please send a declaration to show how your interest.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2011
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Writ of Execution filed wholly unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Writ of Execution filed wholly unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $2,001.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $ 0 Credit: $ 0 Interest: $ 510.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Interest is to high please send a declaration to show how your interest.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE341653.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $ 1,798.18 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $ 0.00 Interest: $ 307.04 Costs: $ 0.00 JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2011
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of counsel re: 1)interest; 2)costs (CCP 1033); 3)attorney fees filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: clerk's judgment vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2011
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Rebecca Howe on 9-2-11 psn .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCL36031.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2011
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Financial info for Midland Funding, LLC: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00016522 Hunt, Michael S $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Financial info for Midland Funding, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Financial: Midland Funding, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $25.00; Total Payments and Credits $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT MICHAEL S