This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 20:49:29 (UTC).

Michelle Budwig vs. Allegiant Air, LLC/REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 Michelle Budwig filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Allegiant Air, LLC/REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark, McGuire, Rosemary, Diaz, Monica and Cabrera, Carlos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1553

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Snauffer, Mark

McGuire, Rosemary

Diaz, Monica

Cabrera, Carlos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Budwig, Michelle

Defendant

Allegiant Air, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shapazian, Larry H.

Defendant Attorney

Hutner, Lindsay E

 

Court Documents

Amended Document Filed

Amended Notice to superior court and adverse party of remova; Comment: Amended Notice to superior court and adverse party of removal of civil action to U.S. district court

Notice of Removal of Action

Notice of Removal; Comment: Notice to Superior Court and Adverse Party of Removal of Civil Action to U.S. District Court

Answer Filed

Answer to Complaint; Comment: Answer to Complaint

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt (form not singed and Title of recipient not listed)

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: with attached certificate of mailing

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury Fee Deposit in the Amount of $150.00 on behalf of Plaintiff, Michelle Budwig

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC and assignment of Judge for all purposes

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2018
  • 60-Day Continued OSC- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:31 AM; Cancel Reason: Removed to Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Document Filed- Amended Notice to superior court and adverse party of remova; Comment: Amended Notice to superior court and adverse party of removal of civil action to U.S. district court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal of Action- Notice of Removal; Comment: Notice to Superior Court and Adverse Party of Removal of Civil Action to U.S. District Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Filed- Answer to Complaint; Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt (form not singed and Title of recipient not listed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: with attached certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • 60-Day Continued OSC- Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos; Hearing Time: 8:31 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Financial info for Allegiant Air, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-57967 Allegiant Air, LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Financial info for Allegiant Air, LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Financial: Allegiant Air, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Financial info for Budwig, Michelle: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-46211 Budwig, Michelle $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Financial info for Budwig, Michelle: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Financial info for Budwig, Michelle: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-23692 Budwig, Michelle $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Financial info for Budwig, Michelle: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Financial: Budwig, Michelle; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLEGIANT AIR LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUTNER LINDSAY ERIN