This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 07:01:04 (UTC).

Michael Oberto, Medical Doctor vs. Central California Faculty Medical Group, Inc

Case Summary

On 09/29/2016 Michael Oberto, Medical Doctor filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Central California Faculty Medical Group, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Black, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3165

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oberto, Michael, Medical Doctor

Defendant

Central California Faculty Medical Group, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smith, Michael J.F.

Defendant Attorney

Blackburn, Steven R

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Oberto, Michael, Medical Doctor; Central California Faculty Medical Group, Inc; Comment: with prejudice.

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Defendant Central California Faculty Medical Group, Inc.'s Compendium Of Federal Authorities In Support Of Defendant's Motion To Compel Arbitration And To Stay Proceedings

Notice of Motion

Motion; Comment: and Motion to: Compel Arbitration and To Stay Proceedings

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Opposition filed

Opposition; Comment: Table of Non-California Authority in Support of Opposition

Opposition filed

Opposition; Comment: Memo of P&As in Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: [proposed] Order Granting Defendant Central California Faculty Medical Group, Inc.'s Motion To Compel Arbitration And To Stay Proceedings

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration Of Elizabeth J. Boca In Support Of Defendant Central California Faculty Medical Group, Inc.'s Motion To Compel Arbitration And To Stay Proceedings

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration Of Robert Frediani In Support Of Defendant Central California Faculty Medical Group, Inc.'s Motion To Compel Arbitration And To Stay Proceedings

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Oberto, Michael, Medical Doctor; Central California Faculty Medical Group, Inc; Comment: with prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Arbitration Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:33 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Arbitration Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 9:03 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: See Minute Order dated 1/24/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Petition - Compel Arbitration- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Uncontested; Comment: Elizabeth Boca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Financial info for Central California Faculty Medical Group, Inc: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-54452 Central California Faculty Medical Group, Inc $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Financial info for Central California Faculty Medical Group, Inc: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Financial: Central California Faculty Medical Group, Inc; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Financial info for Oberto, Michael, Medical Doctor: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-43926 Oberto, Michael $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Financial info for Oberto, Michael, Medical Doctor: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Financial: Oberto, Michael, Medical Doctor; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less