This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 08:29:13 (UTC).

Michael Conte vs. Jeffrey Conte

Case Summary

On 10/11/2016 Michael Conte filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jeffrey Conte. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel and Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2319

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Conte, Michael

Defendant

Conte, Jeffrey Joseph

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Conte, Michael; Awarded Against:; Conte, Jeffrey Joseph; Amount; Damages: $5,896.01; Costs: $105.00; Total: $6001.01; Party Names: Conte, Michael; Conte, Jeffrey Joseph

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Conte, Michael; Awarded Against:; Conte, Jeffrey Joseph; Amount; Damages: $9,579.70; Costs: $105.00; Total: $9684.70; Comment: $75.00 to be paid back to the Court for waived filing fee by the Plaintiff upon first payment of the judgment.; Party Names: Conte, Michael; Conte, Jeffrey Joseph

Letter Received

Letter Received; Comment: RE: Venue change

Small Claims Appeal filed

Small Claims Appeal filed

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to: Vacate Judgment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Jeffrey Joseph Conte

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: 2nd Continuance for service at window

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: with clerk's certificate of mailing

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: with clerk's certificate of mailing

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: Continued hearing

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Fee Waiver Denied

Fee Waiver Denied; Comment: LAST DAY TO PAY: 10/31/2016

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Conte, Michael; Awarded Against:; Conte, Jeffrey Joseph; Amount; Damages: $5,896.01; Costs: $105.00; Total: $6001.01; Party Names: Conte, Michael; Conte, Jeffrey Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Conte, Michael; Awarded Against:; Conte, Jeffrey Joseph; Amount; Damages: $9,579.70; Costs: $105.00; Total: $9684.70; Comment: $75.00 to be paid back to the Court for waived filing fee by the Plaintiff upon first payment of the judgment.; Party Names: Conte, Michael; Conte, Jeffrey Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter Received- Letter Received; Comment: RE: Venue change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Appeal filed- Small Claims Appeal filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Taken under advisement (Small Claims Only)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Order Vacating Judgment- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro- Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2017
  • Financial info for Conte, Jeffrey Joseph: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Financial: Conte, Jeffrey Joseph; Total Financial Assessment $108.10; Total Payments and Credits $108.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Financial info for Conte, Michael: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00003863 Conte, Michael $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Financial info for Conte, Michael: Transaction Assessment $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Financial info for Conte, Michael: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00036413 Conte, Michael $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial info for Conte, Michael: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00035165 Conte, Michael $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial info for Conte, Michael: Transaction Assessment $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Financial info for Conte, Michael: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00034202 Conte, Michael $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Financial info for Conte, Michael: Transaction Assessment $77.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Financial: Conte, Michael; Total Financial Assessment $107.50; Total Payments and Credits $107.50

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.