This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/12/2022 at 10:04:17 (UTC).

Michael Ciolkosz vs. West Acres Shopping

Case Summary

On 01/07/2015 Michael Ciolkosz filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against West Acres Shopping. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, Donald and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0048

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ciolkosz, Michael

Defendants

West Acres Shopping Center

Chili Night Indian Restaurant

West Acres, LLC

Sanger Zavala Renteria

Sanger Fence Company

Chili Nights

Renteria, Samuel Zavala

Cross Plaintiff

Roes 1 through 50

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Sanger Fence Co.

Renteria, Samuel Zavala

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dawood, Sofian Solomon

Law Office Of Sofian Solomon 7944 North Maple Suite #102

Fresno, CA 93720

Dawood, Sofian S.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Trippel, Craig D

Hager, Paul R.

Correll, Deborah A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Judical Notice

Request for Judical Notice

Reply filed

Reply; Comment: Reply to Oppstn to MSJ

Memorandum of Costs filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Total Costs: $ 6,335.01

Reply filed

Civil Document; Comment: of West Acres, LLC to plaintiff's opposition to motion of West Acres, LLC to strike plaintiff's second amended complaint

Declaration Filed

6. SAMUEL ZAVALA RENTERIA DBA SANGER FENCE CO.???S DECLARATI; Comment: of defendant in support of motion for summary judgment

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: of Craig D Trippel

Letter Received

Letter Received; Comment: Letter re Judgment

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Evidence in support of Motion for Summary Judgment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

40685Acknowle00d6162

03/15/2021: 40685Acknowle00d6162

39741Memorand002f3f2

02/16/2021: 39741Memorand002f3f2

Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Full

01/11/2021: Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Full

Acknowledgement of Assignment of Judgment

02/26/2018: Acknowledgement of Assignment of Judgment

Abstract

06/14/2017: Abstract

Notice of Entry of Judgment

05/03/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Abstract

05/01/2017: Abstract

Civil Document

04/10/2017: Civil Document

Judgment

04/07/2017: Judgment

229 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $1,363.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed; Comment: Acknowledgement of Assignment of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ciolkosz, Michael: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-31151 Ciolkosz, Michael $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ciolkosz, Michael: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued; Comment: Amount: $3,582.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for West Acres, LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-22611 West Acres, LLC $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for West Acres, LLC: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
182 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2015
  • DocketAnswer unltd civil case filed; Comment: Answer to complaint filed. le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ciolkosz, Michael: Counter Payment Receipt # 198194 Ciolkosz, Michael $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ciolkosz, Michael: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • FinancialFinancial: Ciolkosz, Michael; Total Financial Assessment $670.00; Total Payments and Credits $670.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • DocketSummons filed; Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. gs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet gs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • DocketPayment; Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt CVCE198194.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Mgnt Conf; Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 07-JAN-2015 by GSAUCEDA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: gs Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • DocketZ_Conversion; Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CORRELL, DEBORAH A