This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:12:41 (UTC).

Medhat Fam vs. Kenyatta Abraham

Case Summary

On 05/22/2017 Medhat Fam filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Kenyatta Abraham. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3864

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fam, Medhat

Defendants

Abraham, Kenya

Abraham, Kenyatta

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leifer, William H.

 

Court Documents

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: UDDI Dismissal

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: All Occupants

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Kenyatta Abraham

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s)

Dismissal of Doe Defendant(s); Comment: Without Prejudice Does: 1- 5

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: No signature on page #1 of CIV 100

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Issued

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of writ of execution filed wholly unsatisfied as to possession only.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Kenyatta Abraham

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: All Occupants

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Issued

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of writ of execuation filed wholly satisfied as to possession only.

Judgment

Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Fam, Medhat; All Occupants; Abraham, Kenyatta; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Fam, Medhat; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 3733 N. Abby Street Fresno, CA 93726; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against:; Abraham, Kenyatta

Judgment

Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Fam, Medhat; All Occupants; Abraham, Kenyatta; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Fam, Medhat; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 3733 N. Abby Street, #203 Fresno, CA 93726; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against:; Abraham, Kenyatta

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Fam, Medhat; Abraham, Kenyatta; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Fam, Medhat; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 3733 N. Abby Street, #203 Fresno, CA 93726; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against:; Abraham, Kenyatta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Restitution of Premises Judgment; Judgment Type: Restitution of Premises Judgment; Party Names: Fam, Medhat; Abraham, Kenyatta; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Fam, Medhat; Entitled to Possession of Premises at:; 3733 N. Abby Street Fresno, CA 93726; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against:; Abraham, Kenyatta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of writ of execuation filed wholly satisfied as to possession only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued- Writ of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Forwarded to clerks office for further processing 7/7/17. Forwarded to Dept: 404 Order for: Amend judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Chambers Work - Post- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Proof of Service of Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession- Comment: DEFECTIVE PROOf: The address where party was served does not match Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Summons and Complaint- Comment: DEFECTIVE PROOF: The address where the party was served does not match Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: RE: All Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Financial info for Fam, Medhat: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00016892 Leifer, William H. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Financial info for Fam, Medhat: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Financial info for Fam, Medhat: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00015783 Leifer, William H. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Financial info for Fam, Medhat: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Financial info for Fam, Medhat: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00012760 Leifer, William H. $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Financial info for Fam, Medhat: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Financial: Fam, Medhat; Total Financial Assessment $290.00; Total Payments and Credits $290.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leifer, William H.