This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/16/2022 at 19:45:17 (UTC).

Mckenzie Erwin vs.Caremeridian, LLC/COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 09/06/2017 Mckenzie Erwin filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Caremeridian, LLC/COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, Donald and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3048

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Black, Donald

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERWIN, MCKENZIE

Defendants

CAREMERIDIAN, LLC

MENTOR MANAGEMENT, INC., d/b/a THE MENTOR NETWORK

Mentor Management, Inc

Caremeridian, LLC, a Limited Liability Company

The Mentor Network

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blumenthal, Norman B

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: in support of request for dismissal

Summons issued and filed

Summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Judgment

Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party Names: Erwin, Mckenzie; Caremeridian, LLC, a Limited Liability Company; Mentor Management, Inc; Comment: without prejudice

Summons issued and filed

Summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Request Filed

Request; Comment: for dismissal

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: request and order for dismissal

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Cover Sheet - Signed NBB.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

p-Complaint.pdf

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Proof of Service

10/23/2017: Proof of Service

Proposed Order

10/23/2017: Proposed Order

Declaration

10/23/2017: Declaration

Request

10/23/2017: Request

POS.pdf

09/14/2017: POS.pdf

Notice of Hearing

09/11/2017: Notice of Hearing

Summons.pdf

09/08/2017: Summons.pdf

Summons.pdf

09/08/2017: Summons.pdf

Civil Cover Sheet - Signed NBB.pdf

09/06/2017: Civil Cover Sheet - Signed NBB.pdf

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party; Names: Erwin, Mckenzie; Caremeridian, LLC, a Limited Liability Company; Mentor Management, Inc; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration; Comment: for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: request and order for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature; Comment: Forwarded to Dept 502 on 10/30/17 for dismissal Forwarded to 4th floor clerk's office for further processing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: in support of request for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Filed; Comment: for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketSummons and Complaint; Served: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Mentor Management, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Erwin, Mckenzie: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-49882 ERWIN, MCKENZIE $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Erwin, Mckenzie: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • FinancialFinancial: Erwin, Mckenzie; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Mentor Network Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CAREMERIDIAN LLC DBA NEURORESTORATIVE OSO NORTH is a litigant

Latest cases where Mentor Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLUMENTHAL NORMAN