This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 08:36:10 (UTC).

Maryann Lindsly vs. David Hussain

Case Summary

On 10/12/2016 Maryann Lindsly filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against David Hussain. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2345

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lindsly, Maryann

Defendants

Hill, Christy

Royal Villa Apartments

Hussain, David

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal SC; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal SC; Party Names: Lindsly, Maryann; Hussain, David; Hill, Christy; Royal Villa Apartments; Comment: With Prejudice

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Hill, Christy; Comment: with prejudice

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: with clerk's certificate of mailing

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Christy Hill, Property Manager Agent

Small Claims case referred to Mediation.

Small Claims case referred to Mediation.; Comment: agreement reached

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe; Comment: by Deputy Clerk

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal SC; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal SC; Party Names: Lindsly, Maryann; Hussain, David; Hill, Christy; Royal Villa Apartments; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Hill, Christy; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Case Status Review- Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: with clerk's certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of; Comment: Name: Christy Hill, Property Manager Agent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims case referred to Mediation.- Small Claims case referred to Mediation.; Comment: agreement reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • Court Trial- Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $40.00-Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $40.00-Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 10/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed- Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe; Comment: by Deputy Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Financial info for Lindsly, Maryann: Fee Waiver $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Financial info for Lindsly, Maryann: Transaction Assessment $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Financial: Lindsly, Maryann; Total Financial Assessment $30.00; Total Payments and Credits $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.