This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 06:32:43 (UTC).

Mary Sierras vs. Carlos Serrato

Case Summary

On 09/26/2016 Mary Sierras filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Carlos Serrato. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale and Cabrera, Carlos. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2187

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Cabrera, Carlos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sierras, Mary

Defendants

Ramirez, Juan

Serrato, Carlos Ablerto Ramirez

Serrato, Carlos Alberto Ramirez

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Sierras, Mary; Awarded Against:; Serrato, Carlos Alberto Ramirez; Ramirez, Juan; Amount; Damages: $1,000.00; Costs: $105.00; Total: $1105.00; Comment: *****CORRECTED JUDGMENT******; Party Names: Sierras, Mary; Serrato, Carlos Alberto Ramirez; Ramirez, Juan

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Sierras, Mary; Awarded Against:; Ramirez, Juan; Serrato, Carlos Alberto Ramirez; Amount; Damages: $1,000.00; Costs: $105.00; Total: $1105.00; Party Names: Sierras, Mary; Serrato, Carlos Alberto Ramirez; Ramirez, Juan

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties; Comment: CORRECTED JUDGMENT

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: with clerk's certificate of mailing

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Sierras, Mary; Awarded Against:; Serrato, Carlos Alberto Ramirez; Ramirez, Juan; Amount; Damages: $1,000.00; Costs: $105.00; Total: $1105.00; Comment: *****CORRECTED JUDGMENT******; Party Names: Sierras, Mary; Serrato, Carlos Alberto Ramirez; Ramirez, Juan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Sierras, Mary; Awarded Against:; Ramirez, Juan; Serrato, Carlos Alberto Ramirez; Amount; Damages: $1,000.00; Costs: $105.00; Total: $1105.00; Party Names: Sierras, Mary; Serrato, Carlos Alberto Ramirez; Ramirez, Juan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties- Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties; Comment: CORRECTED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: with clerk's certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Court Trial- Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Continued Partys Motion - Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $15.00-Unserved/ Defective-Return receipt was undeliverable. Signed by Archive clerk in error.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee: $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 09/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Plaintiff's claim mailed certified mail- Comment: Tracking number:7012 3460 0002 5285 9862

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Plaintiff's claim mailed certified mail- Comment: Tracking number:7012 3460 0002 5285 9831

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial info for Sierras, Mary: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00032736 Sierras, Mary $105.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial info for Sierras, Mary: Transaction Assessment $105.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Financial: Sierras, Mary; Total Financial Assessment $105.00; Total Payments and Credits $105.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.