This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 09:14:19 (UTC).

Martin Vela-Cruz vs.AG Transport, Inc./ COMPLEX/ LEAD CASE

Case Summary

On 01/06/2017 Martin Vela-Cruz filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AG Transport, Inc / COMPLEX/ LEAD CASE. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark, Simpson, Alan, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y., Black, Donald and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0063

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Snauffer, Mark

Simpson, Alan

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Black, Donald

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vela-Cruz, Martin

on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated

Velasquez, Eliser Garcia

Defendants

Flores, Daniel

Flores, Angel

AG Transport, Inc.

AG Transport Inc., a California Corporation

AG Transport

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Albutt, George P.

Gomez, Santos

Defendant Attorney

Glatt, April S., Attorney

 

Court Documents

Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed

Opposition to Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference; Comment: forwarded to dept. 501

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit Payment Angel Flores.pdf; Comment: Complex Fees on Behalf of Defendant Angel Flores

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Change of Calendar Setting

Case Management Statement Filed

Defendants' CMC Statement.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: David A. Lowe

Stipulation Filed

Stipulation re deadline to file responsive pleading; Comment: Stipulation re deadline to file responsive pleading

Decl of Good Faith Attempt Filed Automatic 30-day extension

Decl. Demurring Party ISO Auto Ext.pdf; Comment: Pursuant to CCP 430.41

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons and FAC on Angel Flores; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons and FAC on Angel Flores

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Proposed Order To Vacate The June 20, 2018 C; Comment: Stipulation and Proposed Order To Vacate The June 20, 2018 Class Certification Hearing and Proof of Service

Request Filed

1829020_847AGTranspo; Comment: Continue Pretrial Discovery Conferences Forwarded to Dept 501 on 12-13-17

Stipulation and Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: to modify class certification briefing schedule

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit Payment Daniel Flores.pdf; Comment: Complex Fees on Behalf of Defendant Daniel Flores

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Stipulation Filed

Stipulation re electronic discovery; Comment: Stipulation re electronic discovery

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit

Summons issued and filed

Amended Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Amended Summons

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • General Motion- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: reset from 6/18/19 due to court's unavailability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: of calendar setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)- Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only); Comment: and certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Uncontested; Comment: taken out of advisement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Taken under advisement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Motion - Prelim Approval Class Settlement- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order filed- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Comment: consolidate class action ***Note case previously consolidated 10-12-2017***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: and certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Motion - Prelim Approval Class Settlement- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2017
  • Financial info for Vela-Cruz, Martin: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Financial info for Vela-Cruz, Martin: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-25688 Vela-Cruz, Martin $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Financial info for Vela-Cruz, Martin: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Financial info for Vela-Cruz, Martin: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-19198 Vela-Cruz, Martin $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Financial info for Vela-Cruz, Martin: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Financial info for Vela-Cruz, Martin: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-19121 Vela-Cruz, Martin $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Financial info for Vela-Cruz, Martin: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Financial info for Vela-Cruz, Martin: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-01533 Vela-Cruz, Martin $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Financial info for Vela-Cruz, Martin: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Financial: Vela-Cruz, Martin; Total Financial Assessment $1,725.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,725.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AG TRANSPORT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where on behalf of himself and all members of the putative class is a litigant