This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/01/2018 at 07:18:44 (UTC).

Martin Sala vs. Tabitha Blevins/UD

Case Summary

On 05/09/2012 Martin Sala filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Tabitha Blevins/UD. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0499

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Salas, Martin

Defendant

Blevins, Tabitha Diane

Other

Occupants, All

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Salas, Martin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Judgment - Restitution of Premises

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • Writ filed satisfied poss only- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. j.v

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • Judg - restitution of premises- Comment: Judgment for restitution of premises only signed by Judge Gregory T Fain filed and entered. 1473 Gibson Avenue Clovis, Ca 93611 lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • Stipulation and Order filed- Comment: Stipulation and Agreement (Unlawful Detainer) order signed by Judge Gregory T Fain and filed. : IT IS STIPULATED by Plaintiff Martin Salas and defendant Tabitha Diane Blevins regarding the premises located at 1473 Gibson Avenue Clovis, CA 93611: Possession of the premises is awarded to: Plaintiff. If the plaintiff is awarded possession of the premises in accordance with item 2a or item 2b, plaintiff is also awarded cancellation of the rental agreement. A writ of possession against all occupants will issue immediately, but there will be no lockout before June 27, 2012 6:00am unless defendant defaults on this stipulation. Money damages, fees and costs: Plaintiff is awarded: $4500.00 as past due rent for the period from 9-1-11 to June 26, 2012. Total $4500.00 to be paid in full by installments. Agreement for installment payments Defendant agrees to pay $50.00 on the 11th and 25th day of each month beginning on January 11, 2013 until paid in full. If any payment is more than 0 days late, the total in item 4e less any payments already made, will become immediately due and payable plus interest at the legal rate. All payments will be sent to Plaintiff's P.O. Box. Judgment will be entered now for possession of the premises only. Judgment will be entered as stated in item 7. Plaintiff may establish the failure of defendant to meet the terms of this stipulation and may request entry of judgment by ex parte declaration, without prior notice or hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • Minute order Judge Fain- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: Clovis Clerk: L. Irion Reporter: 11/58/35 Nature of Hearing: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Appearing Parties: Plaintiff: Martin Salas - Pro Per Defendant: Tabitha Diane Blevins - Pro Per Matter referred to Mediation. Stipulation and Agreement (Unlawful Detainer) signed in Mediation by both parties IT IS STIPULATED by Plaintiff Martin Salas and defendant Tabitha Diane Blevins regarding the premises located at 1473 Gibson Avenue Clovis, CA 93611: Possession of the premises is awarded to: Plaintiff. If the plaintiff is awarded possession of the premises in accordance with item 2a or item 2b, plaintiff is also awarded cancellation of the rental agreement. A writ of possession against all occupants will issue immediately, but there will be no lockout before June 27, 2012 6:00am unless defendant defaults on this stipulation. Money damages, fees and costs: Plaintiff is awarded: $4500.00 as past due rent for the period from 9-1-11 to June 26, 2012. Total $4500.00 to be paid in full by installments. Agreement for installment payments Defendant agrees to pay $50.00 on the 11th and 25th day of each month beginning on January 11, 2013 until paid in full. If any payment is more than 0 days late, the total in item 4e less any payments already made, will become immediately due and payable plus interest at the legal rate. All payments will be sent to Plaintiff's P.O. Box. Judgment will be entered now for possession of the premises only. Judgment will be entered as stated in item 7. Plaintiff may establish the failure of defendant to meet the terms of this stipulation and may request entry of judgment by ex parte declaration, without prior notice or hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 06-JUN-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL39284.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. 1473 Gibson Avenue Clovis, CA 93611 LOS 6-27-12 at 6am lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 cg Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on UD Complaint filed. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet of UD Complaint. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: cg Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 09-MAY-2012 by CGU.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 09-MAY-2012 by CGU.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 09-MAY-2012 by CGU.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • Financial info for Salas, Martin: Counter Payment Receipt # 38942 Salas, Martin $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • Financial info for Salas, Martin: Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • Financial: Salas, Martin; Total Financial Assessment $240.00; Total Payments and Credits $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less