This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:44:12 (UTC).

Martin Berber vs. H/S Development Company/COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 06/20/2016 Martin Berber filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against H/S Development Company/COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Snauffer, Mark, McGuire, Rosemary, Tharpe, D Tyler and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1964

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Snauffer, Mark

McGuire, Rosemary

Tharpe, D Tyler

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rivera, Maria

Mendoza, Erasmo, JR

Gallardo, Olivia

Rivera, Raul

Solorio, Maria

Diaz, Victor

Brambila, Gloria

Jimenez, Eustolia

Perez, Alicia

Reyna, Soila

Bueno, Jocelyn

Cruz, Enrique

Civico, Michael

Lazaro, Maria

Solorio, Ana

Defendants

Oriole Homes, Inc., a California Corporation

Chowchilla Investment CO., LP, a California Limited Partnership

HDC Homes, Inc., a California Corporation

Mendota Investment Company Limited LP, a Delaware Limited Partnership

H/S Development Company, LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company

99 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Golub, Mitchell S

Defendant Attorney

Marking, John R.

Other Attorneys

Cannon, Catherine M.

Cano, Gino

Frankenberger, David J.

Fidger, Angela R.

Tierney, Justin N.

Kennick, Michael T.

Doran, James W.

Fischer, Todd A.

Koper, Jacob

Zumstein, Matthew D.

O'Hara, Timothy W

Moore, Penny S.

Shapiro, Megan A.

Campagne, Thomas E.

Czelusnlak, David E.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons upon Central Valley Housing Company, LLC; Comment: As to Central Valley Housing Company, LLC.

Answer Filed

14X8646.pdf; Comment: to 1st cross complaint

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: BMC West Corporation; Comment: without prejudice

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: Order signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing Forwarded to: Dept. 501 Order for: Service of Summons on Cross-Defendant Souza's Heating & Cooling's Insurance Carriers for Estate of Jefferey James Boyer, Deceased Owner of Souza's Heating & Cooling

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Pre-Trial Order No. 7

Amendment filed

Amendment to Complaint; Comment: Duplicate filing

Answer Filed

Answer to X-Complaint.pdf

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: HDC Homes, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Unverified Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Declaration Filed

Dec of Jacob Koper in support of Motion.pdf; Comment: of Jacob Koper in support of Motion for Leave to Intervene

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached

Case Management Statement Filed

CMC Stmt 3 parties.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Answer Filed

Answer to X-Comp by Shinen.pdf; Comment: to 1st Cross-Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons on 1st Cross-Complaint

Application Filed

Application; Comment: Application For Determination of Good Faith Settlement

285 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: JBJ Plumbing, Inc; Jim Moulton Corporation; Mark Jantz Electric; R & S Fence, Inc; Souza's Heating & Cooling; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: San Joaquin Sand & Gravel; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: River City Building Supply, Inc; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: P.R. Plumbing Heating & Air Conditioning; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Al Cal Specialty Contracting, Inc; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Central Valley Concrete, Inc; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: CLF Enterprises, Inc; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Valley Trenching Inc., a California Corporation; Comment: With Prejudice; Comment: (As to Defendant in 1st Cross Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment: ((as to 2nd Cross Complaint)); Party Names: Central Valley Concrete, Inc.; ROES 1-100 Inclusive; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: 47th Place Carpet & Linoleum, Inc; Comment: with prejudice; Comment: (As to Defendant in 1st Cross-Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
453 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2017
  • Financial info for Lopez, Joel Meza: Transaction Assessment $1150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Financial: Lopez, Joel Meza; Total Financial Assessment $1,150.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Financial info for H/S Development Company, LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2016-05900 H/S Development Company, LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Financial info for H/S Development Company, LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company: Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Financial info for H/S Development Company, LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2016-05294 H/S Development Company, LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Financial info for H/S Development Company, LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • Financial: H/S Development Company, LLC, a Washington Limited Liability Company; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Financial info for Berber, Martin: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00022323 Eddings Attorney Support SVCS, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Financial info for Berber, Martin: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Financial: Berber, Martin; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.