This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 07/30/2020 at 03:32:23 (UTC).

Martha Magdaleno vs. Miguel Torres/LEAD CASE

Case Summary

On 02/21/2017 Martha Magdaleno filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Miguel Torres/LEAD CASE. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Gaab, Kimberly and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0520

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Gaab, Kimberly

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Castaneda, Jose Antonio

Aguilar, Jonathan

Sagrero, Juan

Quinonez, Mike

Magdaleno, Jaime

Sagrero, Armando Luis

Magdaleno, Martha

Aviles, Ricardo Quintero

Pantaleon, Ruben

Saavedra, Sergio

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Hovanisian, John

ME Management aka ME Enterprises

Torres, Miguel

J and V Properties, Inc., a Corporation

Hovanisian, David

ME Management

Miguel Torres doing business as ME Management Services

J & V Properties, Inc., a California corporation

ME Enterprises

Miguel Torres dba ME Management Services

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schwin, Kevin

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Lampe, Michael J.

Williams, Steven R.

Hahesy, William C.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Comment: (causes of action 7-12 as to Plaintiff Juan Sagrero without prejudice)

General Denial Filed

general denial

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: John Hovanisian

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC and assignment of Judge for all purposes

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Michael P. Smith in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Obey Discovery Order

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Calendar Setting and Certificate of Mailing **Trial Setting Conference set for 5/11/2020 is continued to 6/8/2020**

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Memorandum of Costs

Memorandum of Costs filed

Memorandum of Costs; Comment: Total Costs: $995.00

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: and Certificate of Mailing

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment; Comment: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Judgment (Proposed)

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketMotion - Dismiss- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Michael Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: *Department Change*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for J & V Properties, Inc., a California corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-39059 J & V Properties, Inc., a California corporation $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for J & V Properties, Inc., a California corporation: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Michael P. Smith in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Obey Discovery Order

    Read MoreRead Less
182 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference- Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Castaneda, Jose Antonio; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Req 4 Dismissal Jose Antonio Castaneda.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC and assignment of Judge for all purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sagrero, Armando Luis: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-09602 Sagrero, Armando Luis $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sagrero, Armando Luis: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • FinancialFinancial: Sagrero, Armando Luis; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed- Summons w-additional parties attachments.pdf; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- Complaint w-Exs A-M (OCR'd & Bkmrkd).pdf

    Read MoreRead Less