This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 02:38:14 (UTC).

CONSOLIDATED WITH 16CECG02119

Case Summary

On 08/24/2016 CONSOLIDATED WITH 16CECG02119 was filed as a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y, Simpson, Alan and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2776

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y

Simpson, Alan

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cuevas, Martha

Defendant

Lyons Magnus, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selik, Evan M

Defendant Attorney

Sagaser, Howard A

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: of filing stipulation and proposed order to relate and consolidate cases

Conditional Settlement Reached

Notice of Settlement; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 12/1/17

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: 225 set for 2/5/18 at 1:00pm Rm #104

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: From Chambers re: CMC

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Judgment Type: Order Consolidating Actions; Party Names: Cuevas, Martha; Lyons Magnus, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice; Comment: of filing stipulation and proposed order to relate and consolidate cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Conditional Settlement Reached- Notice of Settlement; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 12/1/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: 225 set for 2/5/18 at 1:00pm Rm #104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: From Chambers re: CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer Filed- Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Financial info for Lyons Magnus, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-38460 Lyons Magnus, Inc. $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Financial info for Lyons Magnus, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Financial: Lyons Magnus, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Financial info for Cuevas, Martha: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-37430 Cuevas, Martha $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Financial info for Cuevas, Martha: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Financial: Cuevas, Martha; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less