This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 20:44:49 (UTC).

CONSOLIDATED WITH 16CECG02119

Case Summary

On 07/11/2016 CONSOLIDATED WITH 16CECG02119 was filed as a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y, Simpson, Alan and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2225

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y

Simpson, Alan

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cuevas, Martha

Defendant

Lyons Magnus, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selik, Evan M

Defendant Attorney

Wieland, Ian B.

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: of filing stipulation and proposed order to relate and consolidate cases

Conditional Settlement Reached

Notice of Settlement; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 12/1/17

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: Order signed and issued 08/29/2016 Forwarded to Dept: 402 on 8/26/16 Stipulation and Order for: Continue motion to compel arbitration

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: of Ian B. Wieland in support of petition to compel

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Comment: in support of petition to compel

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: to Complaint.

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Petition - Compel Arbitration

Notice Filed

Notice of Entry???of Order; Comment: Notice of Entry???of Order

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: to continue CMC. CMC continued to 1/17/17 at 10am #104

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: Stip and Order signed and issued. FF to clerks office 11/03/2016, for further processing. Stipulation and Order: Forward To: Dept. #402 for Signature on 11-2-16

Notice Filed

Notice of Related Case; Comment: Notice of Related Case

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Deft's Mtn to Compel Arbitration cont from 09/09/2016 to 12/08/2016

Notice Filed

Notice of Petition; Comment: Notice of Petition to compel

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Judgment Type: Order Consolidating Actions; Party Names: Cuevas, Martha; Lyons Magnus, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Consolidated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice; Comment: of filing stipulation and proposed order to relate and consolidate cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: continued per order signed 11/3/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Petition - Compel Arbitration- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Ian Weland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Conditional Settlement Reached- Notice of Settlement; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 12/1/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: 225 set for 2/5/18 at 1:00pm RM #104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Petition - Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Petition - Compel Arbitration- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Continued Court's Motion; Comment: Ian Weland w/order to stay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice of Entry???of Order; Comment: Notice of Entry???of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2016
  • Financial info for Lyons Magnus, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-34549 Lyons Magnus, Inc. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Financial info for Lyons Magnus, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Financial info for Lyons Magnus, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-34136 Lyons Magnus, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Financial info for Lyons Magnus, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Financial: Lyons Magnus, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $515.00; Total Payments and Credits $515.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Financial info for Cuevas, Martha: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-37693 Cuevas, Martha $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Financial info for Cuevas, Martha: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Financial info for Cuevas, Martha: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-29230 Cuevas, Martha $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Financial info for Cuevas, Martha: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Financial: Cuevas, Martha; Total Financial Assessment $1,455.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,455.00

    Read MoreRead Less