This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 02:26:31 (UTC).

Marquis L. Bell vs Melissa Lank Bell

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Marquis L Bell filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Melissa Lank Bell. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Meehan, Kathleen A and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6661

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Meehan, Kathleen A

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Other and Petitioner

Bell, Marquis L.

Fresno, CA 93722

Respondent

Bell, Melissa Lank

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • Judge Meehan Minute Order. See attached.- Comment: Judge: K. Meehan Clerk: Julie Ramirez Reporter: Not Reported Petitioner: Not Present Respondent: Present/ Pro Per Hearing Type: gen mtn Other: Court will deny the Respondents request for spousal support based on the fact that the Court has no jurisdiction. The Judgment filed in October, 2014 terminates Courts jurisdiction for spousal support.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • Readiness Motion - Modification of Spousal Support- Judicial Officer: Meehan, Kathleen A; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Denied; Parties Present- Conversion: Bell, Marquis L.; Parties Present- Respondent: Bell, Melissa Lank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • Historical Documents- Comment: DMS Conversion Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2015
  • Filed proof service by mail- Comment: Proof of Service of FL 300; FL 320; FL 150 filed. Served on Marquis Bell by Mail on 02/25/15 from Clovis, CA lml 02/27/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • Mtn Mod Spouse Spt-no fees- Comment: Modify SS 5/12/15 10am D204 mep 2/23/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • Income & Expense Declaration- Comment: mep 2/23/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Minute order from Dept: 204 Clerk: J. Ramirez Reporter: NR Nature of Hearing: Petitioner: Not Present Respondent: Not Present Continued to: No appearance by either party, matter is off calendar. JJR 02/17/15 Event: Minute Order Judge Meehan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • Motion - Readiness Motion- Judicial Officer: Meehan, Kathleen A; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • Readiness Motion - Spousal Support- Judicial Officer: Meehan, Kathleen A; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2014
  • Notice of Cal Setting Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 23-APR-2014 by TFLORES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • Notice of Cal Setting Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 23-APR-2014 by TFLORES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2014
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona mv12/16/2013 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. mv12/16/2013 Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Order Granting Waiver of Fees- Comment: Order signed Yes _X__ No ___ mv12/16/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Income & Expense Declaration- Comment: mv12/16/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Summons Issued Yes _X__ No ___ Case Assigned to Judge Duncan for all Purposes mv12/16/2013 Event: Pet Disso Mar-no child-No Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by MVANG.

    Read MoreRead Less