This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/08/2020 at 15:03:05 (UTC).

Marleen Ramirez vs. Jimmy Wilson

Case Summary

On 11/08/2018 Marleen Ramirez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Jimmy Wilson. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Black, Donald, Tharpe, D Tyler and Simpson, Alan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4148

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Black, Donald

Tharpe, D Tyler

Simpson, Alan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ramirez, Marleen

Ramirez, Ricardo, JR

Ramirez, Ricardo

Defendants

Baker Commodities, Inc.,

Wilson, Jimmy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rabieian, Debora

Defendant Attorney

Trippel, Craig D

 

Court Documents

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Reassignment of Judge

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: Defendants granted leave to file 1st Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation And Order Granting Defendants Jimmy Wilson And; Comment: Signed and returned to clerk's office for further processing Forwarded to: 502 Stipulation And Order Granting Defendants Jimmy Wilson And Baker Commodities Inc Leave To File First Amended Answer To Plaintiffs Complaint

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation Regarding Alternative Dispute Resolution ( ADR); Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Hon. Patrick O'Hara

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

2639197_772CMSMarlee; Comment: case management statement

Case Management Statement Filed

Hrg: 4/30/19 - Case Management Statement

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury Fees

Answer Filed

Answer

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketJury Trial- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Jury both; 5 to 7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketTrial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order filed- Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Comment: Defendants granted leave to file 1st Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Reassignment of Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Simpson, Alan; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wilson, Jimmy: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-76131 Wilson, Jimmy $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Wilson, Jimmy: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Received for Signature- Stipulation And Order Granting Defendants Jimmy Wilson And; Comment: Signed and returned to clerk's office for further processing Forwarded to: 502 Stipulation And Order Granting Defendants Jimmy Wilson And Baker Commodities Inc Leave To File First Amended Answer To Plaintiffs Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketOSC - ADR Stipulation- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:32 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketChambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Guardian Ad Litem Received- 2262848_537GuardianA; Comment: Signed and returned to clerk's office for further processing Forwarded to: 502

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Guardian Ad Litem Received- 2262848_659GuardianA; Comment: Signed and returned to clerk's office for further processing Forwarded to: 502

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC/CJAP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Marleen: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-82178 Ramirez, Marleen $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Marleen: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Ramirez, Marleen; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet- 2260885_549CivilCase

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed- 2260885_507Compalint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAKER COMMODITIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RABIEIAN DEBORA