This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:24:03 (UTC).

Mark Forrest vs Fruit Patch Sales

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Mark Forrest filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fruit Patch Sales. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Ikeda, Dale, Black, Donald and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3847

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Ikeda, Dale

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Forrest, Mark

Defendant

Fruit Patch Sales LLC

Cross Plaintiff

Forrest, Mark Alan

Cross Defendant

Fruit Patch Sales, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vehrs, Roger K.

P.O. Box 1952

Fresno, CA 93721

 

Court Documents

Ex parte Filed

Ex parte Filed; Comment: application for order shortening time to hear motion to be relieved as counsel

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Ruling Date: June 2, 2015 Time: 3:30pm Dept. 502

Judgment

Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Forrest, Mark; Awarded Against:; Fruit Patch Sales LLC; Amount; Damages: $25,763.70; Attorney Fees: $27,790.80; Total: $53554.50

Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion; Comment: and Motion to: Withdrawal as Counsel

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Order filed

Order filed; Comment: Order granting attorney's motion to be relieved as counsel

Answer Filed

Civil Document; Comment: to Cross complaint le

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Re: Ex Parte Hearing on 5/26/15

List filed

List filed; Comment: Courtroom exhibit list

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Entry of Order on Coleman & Horowitt, LLP's Moiton to be Relieved as Counsel of Record

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Forrest, Mark; Awarded Against:; Fruit Patch Sales LLC; Amount; Damages: $25,763.70; Attorney Fees: $27,790.80; Total: $53554.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Forwarded to Dept:502 Order for:Proposed Judgment/signed & returned to clerk's office for further processing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • List filed- List filed; Comment: Courtroom exhibit list

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • Exhibit List Filed- Comment: by Plaintiff Shelf C-4, Box 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • Default Hearing- Original Type: Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Plaintiff: Forrest, Mark; Parties Present- Attorney: Vehrs, Roger K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2015
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Plaintiff; Parties Present- Attorney: Vehrs, Roger K.

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2015
  • Financial info for Fruit Patch Sales LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00005286 Parvanian, Paul M. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • Financial info for Fruit Patch Sales LLC: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Financial info for Fruit Patch Sales LLC: Counter Payment Receipt # 186102 Fruit Patch Sales LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Financial info for Fruit Patch Sales LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • Financial: Fruit Patch Sales LLC; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • Financial info for Forrest, Mark: Counter Payment Receipt # 192404 Forrest, Mark $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • Financial info for Forrest, Mark: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Forrest, Mark: Counter Payment Receipt # 185122 Forrest, Mark $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Forrest, Mark: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial: Forrest, Mark; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less