This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 05/18/2018 at 03:01:59 (UTC).

Marisol Zitron vs, Ronald D. Patterson

Case Summary

On 06/16/2014 Marisol Zitron vs, Ronald D Patterson was filed as a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Black, Donald, Gamoian, Lisa and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1718

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Black, Donald

Gamoian, Lisa

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zitron, Marisol

Defendants

Patterson, Ronald D.

R & C Patterson Family Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Murillo, Joel M.

1095 N. Fulton St.

Fresno, CA 93728

Defendant Attorney

Pinion, G. Bryan

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached certificate of mailing

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer to Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service on Ronald D Patterson, Sub service/dec attached

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: ADR stipulation filed 03-20-17

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: as to Ronald D. Patterson, ONLY

Amended Document Filed

Amended Summons; Amended Document Filed; Comment: Amended Summons Issued and Filed.

Amended Document Filed

Amended Summons; Amended Document Filed; Comment: Amended Summons Issued and Filed.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Comment: Type of Document: Summons and Complaint by Publication as to Ronald D. Patterson in the Fresno Bee. (conform copies it tickler under "M")

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Trial Setting Conference- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Requested by Defendant with an estimated time of 2-5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2016
  • Financial: Patterson, Ronald D.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Financial info for Zitron, Marisol: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00022746 Zitron, Marisol $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Financial info for Zitron, Marisol: Transaction Assessment $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Financial info for Zitron, Marisol: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00018370 Zitron, Marisol $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Financial info for Zitron, Marisol: Transaction Assessment $0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Financial info for Zitron, Marisol: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00013731 Zitron, Marisol $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Financial info for Zitron, Marisol: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • Financial info for Zitron, Marisol: Counter Payment Receipt # 191366 Zitron, Marisol $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • Financial info for Zitron, Marisol: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • Financial: Zitron, Marisol; Total Financial Assessment $456.00; Total Payments and Credits $456.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

5. October 17,2014 at 11:58 a.m.: 10186 Root Creek Road, Madera, California 93636

6. October 17, 2014 at 11:59 a.m.: 10170 Root Creek .Road, Madera, California 93636

7. October 17,2014 at 12:11 p.m.: 12272'Waverly Rd., Madera, California 93636

8. October 17, 2014 at 12:30 p.m.: 37844 Myrtlewood Dr., Madera, California 93636

9. October 17, 2014 at 12:49 p.m.: 14054 Killarney Dr., Madera, California 93636

10. October 17, 2014 at 2:56 p.m.:. 5741 E. Central Ave., Fresno, California 93725

11. November 18, 2014 at 8:15 a.m.: 4644 W. Jennifer, Suite 106, Fresno, California 93722 12. November 19, 2014 at 9:24 a.m.: 4644 W. Jennifer, Suite 106, Fresno, California 93722

I declare under penalty of perjury under the laws of the State of California that th foregoing is true and correct.

Dated: April 11, 2016 3

joel M.. Murillo

POINTS & AUTHORITIES

As set forth in the DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE of LAURIE ROBINSON, a registered process server and in the Declaration of Joel M. Murillo, reaéonab]e attempts at personal service upon defendant of the summons and complaint have been made as required by California Code of Civil Procedure § 415.10. Plaintiff is not aware of the dwelling house, usual place of abode, place of business or mailing address of defendant - Ronald D. Patterson, so plaintiff is unable to serve defendant by substituted service pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure § 415.20(b). Thus plai;ltiff has made a proper shoWing for the court to issfie an order that the summons and complaint be published in “The Fresno Bee” once a week for a period of four successive weeks, and that i

the whereabouts or address are ascertained before the time prescribed for publication of

Ex Parte Application for Order for Publication of Summons and Complaint, Marisol Zitron v Ronald D. Patterson, et Al Fresno Superior Court Case: /4CECG01718DSB

Ex Parte Application for Order for Publication of Summons and Complaint, Marisol Zitron v Ronald D. Patterson, et Al Fresno Superior Court Case: /4CECG01718DSB summons expires, that the plaintiff personally serve, or effectuate substituted service mail of the summons and complaint, on defendant Ronald D. Patterson.

summons expires, that the plaintiff personally serve, or effectuate substituted service mail of the summons and complaint, on defendant Ronald D. Patterson.

Respectfully submitted,

April 11, 2016 I SNl

‘ bel M. Murillo \Attorney for plaintiff

Ex Parte Application for Order for Publication of Summons and Complaint, Marisol Zitron v Ronald D. Patterson, et Al Fresno Superior Court Case: 14CECG01718DSB