This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 05:48:00 (UTC).

Maricela Vazquez vs. Aimhigh Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company

Case Summary

On 09/20/2016 Maricela Vazquez filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Aimhigh Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark, Snauffer, Mark and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3062

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Snauffer, Mark

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vazquez, Maricela

on behalf of herself and other former and current employees similarly situated

Defendants

Aimhigh Group LLC

Khangura, Mandeep

Gurcharan, Rakkar

Aimhigh Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vasquez, George J.

Defendant Attorney

Harris, Richard A.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached certificate of mailing

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: James M. PHillips

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Without judgment

Amended Document Filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: First Amended Summons

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Ex parte application for leave to file second amended complaint

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint; Comment: Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Change of Calendar Settings

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service by First-Class Mail

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer of Defendant, Aimhigh Group, LLC to Second Amended Complaint

Amended Document Filed

Amended Complaint - Claim Amount Unchanged (No Fee); Comment: Second Amended Complaint filed

Notice Filed

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury fee deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of plaintiff

Order Received for Signature

Amendment to Complaint; Comment: (Order signed; Forwarded to clerks office for further processing) Forwarded to: Dept. 403 Order for: doe amendment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of FAC to Aimhigh by mail of first amended complaint

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Requested by Plaintiff with an estimated time of 5-7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granted- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Motion to be relieved as counsel. Effective upon filing the proof of service of this order upon the client.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Motion - Withdrawal of Attorney- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard; Comment: Richard Harris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Change of Calendar Settings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Proposed Order; Comment: Order signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing ***Pending Until Hearing***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2018
  • Financial info for Aimhigh Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-02788 Aimhigh Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Financial info for Aimhigh Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Financial info for Aimhigh Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-15601 Aimhigh Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Financial info for Aimhigh Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Financial: Aimhigh Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Financial info for Vazquez, Maricela: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-03397 Vazquez, Maricela $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Financial info for Vazquez, Maricela: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Financial info for Vazquez, Maricela: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-42301 Vazquez, Maricela $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Financial info for Vazquez, Maricela: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Financial: Vazquez, Maricela; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less