This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 14:23:31 (UTC).

Maria Tucker vs. Augustina Hernandez

Case Summary

On 03/23/2018 Maria Tucker filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Augustina Hernandez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Diaz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0136

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Diaz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tucker, Maria

Defendant

Hernandez, Augustina

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Judgment After Trial de Novo; Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Judgment Type: Judgment After Trial de Novo; Party Names: Tucker, Maria; Hernandez, Augustina; Comment: (See 18CESC00136 for Judgment - Non-Monetary Award)

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Small Claims Appeal filed

Small Claims Appeal filed

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment After Trial de Novo; Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Judgment Type: Judgment After Trial de Novo; Party Names: Tucker, Maria; Hernandez, Augustina; Comment: (See 18CESC00136 for Judgment - Non-Monetary Award)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Taken Under Submission or Advisement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Small Claim Appeal- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 03/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing- Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the (Notice of Hearing ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 03/23/18 ) . Parties served: ( All Parties )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing- Comment: I certify that I am not a party to this cause and a true copy of the ( Small Claims Appeal ) was placed in a sealed envelope and placed for collection and mailing on the date and at the place shown below following our ordinary business practice. I am readily familiar with this court's practice for collection and processing correspondence for mailing. On the same day that correspondence is placed for collection and mailing, it is deposited in the ordinary course of business with the United States Postal Service with postage fully prepaid. Place of Mailing: Fresno, California on ( 03/21/18 ) . Parties served: (plaintiff )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Appeal filed- Small Claims Appeal filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Small Claims case referred to Mediation.- Comment: no agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed- Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Financial info for Tucker, Maria: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2018-00003971 Tucker, Maria $0.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Financial info for Tucker, Maria: Transaction Assessment $0.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Financial: Tucker, Maria; Total Financial Assessment $0.60; Total Payments and Credits $0.60

    Read MoreRead Less