This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 06/19/2022 at 09:10:55 (UTC).

Maria Sorroza vs. Thomas Matthew Maslowski

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 Maria Sorroza filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Thomas Matthew Maslowski. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno County BF Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5478

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sorroza, Maria

Defendant

Maslowski, Thomas Matthew

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Keck, Timothy J.

 

Court Documents

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint.pdf

Summons issued and filed

Summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CMC Hearing Date 9/24/2018

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action.pdf

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Sorroza, Maria; Maslowski, Thomas Matthew; Comment: With prejudice

Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf

05/31/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet.pdf

Complaint.pdf

05/31/2018: Complaint.pdf

Summons.pdf

06/01/2018: Summons.pdf

Summons.pdf

06/01/2018: Summons.pdf

Notice of Hearing

06/01/2018: Notice of Hearing

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action.pdf

09/17/2018: Request for Dismissal - Entire Action.pdf

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party; Names: Sorroza, Maria; Maslowski, Thomas Matthew; Comment: With prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sorroza, Maria: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-39482 Sorroza, Maria $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Sorroza, Maria: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Sorroza, Maria; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comment: CMC Hearing Date 9/24/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Complaint filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case cover sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

PLD-PI-001 FOR COURT USE ONLY E-FILED

5/31/2018 5:45 PM

FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT

By: S. Lout, Deputy

[ X ] ACTIONIS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE

Amount demanded does not exceed $10,000

exceeds $10,000, but does not exceed $25,000 [ ] ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000)

ACTION IS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint [__] from limited to unlimited from unlimited to limited

1. Plaintiff (name or names): MARIA SORROZA

alleges causes of action against defendant (name or names): THOMAS MATTHEW MASLOWSKI; and Does 1 to 25, inclusive. 2. This pleading, inciuding attachments and exhibits, consists of the following number of pages: 5 3. Each plaintiff named above is a competent aduit a. [ | except plaintiff (name): (1) || a corporation qualified to do business in California (2) {__] anunincorporated entity (describe): (3) [__| apublic entity (describe): (4 [ | aminor [ ] an adult (@) ___] forwhoma guardian or conservator of the estate or a guardian ad litem has been appointed (b) [___] other (specify): (5) || other (specify):

case numeer L8CECL05478

PLD-PI-001

SHORT TITLE: SORROZA v. MASLOWSKI

10. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action aftached):

Motor Vehicie

General Negiigence

Intentional Tort

Products Liability

Premises Liability

Other (specify):

{TYPE OR PRINT NAME) _ (SIGNATURE OF PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keck, Timothy J