This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 11:04:40 (UTC).

Maria Rodriguez (Owner) vs. Susanna Alvarez

Case Summary

On 10/31/2016 Maria Rodriguez Owner filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Susanna Alvarez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Gamoian, Lisa, Cabrera, Carlos and Dalesandro, Samuel. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8742

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Gamoian, Lisa

Cabrera, Carlos

Dalesandro, Samuel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maria Rodriguez (Owner)

Christina Chaparro (Agent)

Defendants

Alvarez, Robert

Alvarez, Susanna

Other

All Occupants

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Maria Rodriguez (Owner); Christina Chaparro (Agent); Alvarez, Susanna; Alvarez, Robert; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Maria Rodriguez (Owner); Christina Chaparro (Agent); Awarded Against:; Alvarez, Susanna; Alvarez, Robert; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $850.00; Holdover Damages: $1,700.00; Costs: $400.00; Total: $2,950.00; Comment: conformed copy in tickler R

Declaration for Default Judgment by Court filed

Declaration for Default Judgment by Court filed

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: **Default previously entered on 12-12-16**

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Order Denied

Order Denied; Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos; Comment: Judgment is denied. Resubmit with past due rent and holdover damages as separate items.

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Declaration for Default Judgment by Court filed

Declaration for Default Judgment by Court filed

Request to Enter Default Denied

Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: Date of #6 (b) is after signed under penalty of perjury. Amount on #2 does not match amount on Judgment form.

Declaration for Default Judgment by Court filed

Declaration for Default Judgment by Court filed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Susanna Alvarez

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: RE: Robert Alvarez

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice of Hearing

Civil Document; Comment: UDDI Dismissal

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed

Civil Document

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Maria Rodriguez (Owner); Christina Chaparro (Agent); Alvarez, Susanna; Alvarez, Robert; All Occupants; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To:; Maria Rodriguez (Owner); Christina Chaparro (Agent); Awarded Against:; Alvarez, Susanna; Alvarez, Robert; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $850.00; Holdover Damages: $1,700.00; Costs: $400.00; Total: $2,950.00; Comment: conformed copy in tickler R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: If FTA, Case to be dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Judgment Received- Comment: Forward to: Dept 401 Judge Dale Ikeda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Default Judgment by Court filed- Declaration for Default Judgment by Court filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default Denied- Request to Enter Default Denied; Comment: **Default previously entered on 12-12-16**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Request for Default Received- Comment: With Judgment No Tag, No SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Denied- Order Denied; Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos; Comment: Judgment is denied. Resubmit with past due rent and holdover damages as separate items.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Civil Document; Comment: UDDI Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Financial info for Christina Chaparro (Agent): Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00036397 Christina Chaparro (Agent) $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Financial info for Christina Chaparro (Agent): Transaction Assessment $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • Financial: Christina Chaparro (Agent); Total Financial Assessment $240.00; Total Payments and Credits $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Financial info for Maria Rodriguez (Owner): Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00003367 Maria Rodriguez (Owner) $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Financial info for Maria Rodriguez (Owner): Transaction Assessment $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Financial: Maria Rodriguez (Owner); Total Financial Assessment $1.00; Total Payments and Credits $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.