This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/08/2018 at 22:52:53 (UTC).

Maria Machado vs Ruben Curiel

Case Summary

On 11/17/2014 Maria Machado filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Ruben Curiel. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Black, Donald, Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Cullers, Mark, Gamoian, Lisa and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3448

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Black, Donald

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Cullers, Mark

Gamoian, Lisa

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Machado, Maria L Henriquez

Defendants

Curiel, Ruben

Reyes, Larissa Ann

Domile Investments

Curiel, Norma

Valenton, Celia

Tiscareno, Stephanie

Escobedo, Rosendo

Meelo Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nunez, Tomas

3248 East Shields Avenue Suite A

Fresno, CA 93726

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Machado Proof of Publication

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Valenton, Celia; Tiscareno, Stephanie; Escobedo, Rosendo; Meelo Corporation; Comment: With Prejudice

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document

Dismissal Not Entered

Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: The listed parties above have already been dismissed With Prejudice on 6/02/2016.

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: certificate of mailing attached

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Tomas Nunez in Support of Judgment [CCP Section 585]

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed

Application to Post/Publish Summons and Complaint; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Comment: signed and returned to cler's office for further processing Machado Applicaiton and Order for Publication

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Valenton, Celia; Tiscareno, Stephanie; Escobedo, Rosendo; Meelo Corporation; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Default Hearing- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Comment: Thomas Nunez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:32 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)- Civil Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Default Hearing- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Uncontested; Comment: Tomas Nunez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2014
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 17-NOV-2014 by LESPARZA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: le Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet le

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Financial info for Machado, Maria L Henriquez: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-33542 Machado, Maria L Henriquez $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Financial info for Machado, Maria L Henriquez: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Financial info for Machado, Maria L Henriquez: Counter Payment Receipt # 196539 Machado, Maria L Henriquez $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Financial info for Machado, Maria L Henriquez: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Financial: Machado, Maria L Henriquez; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Seventh Cause Of Action Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress Against Defendants Curiel, Reyes, Domile Investments, Inc. and Norma

52. Plaintiff refers to and incorporates paragraphs 1 through 51 into this cause of action as if fully set forth.

53. Defendants’ conduct was outrageous.

54. Defendants intended to cause Plaintiff emotional distress in that Defendants intended to defraud Plaintiff out of $53,000.00.

55. Defendants acted with reckless disregard of the probability that Plaintiff would suffer emotional distress, knowing that Plaintiff was present when the conduct occurred.

56. i’laintifl‘ suffered emotional distress.

57. Defendants’ conduct was a substantial factor in causing Plaintiff severe emotional distress, all to her damage in excess of $25,000.00.

Eighth Cause Of Action Concealment Of A Material Fact Against Defendants Curiel, Reyes, Domile Investments, Inc. and Norma

58. Plaintiff refers to and incorporates paragraphs 1 through 57 into this cause of action as if fully set forth.

59. Defendants owed a fiduciary duty to Plaintiff because Defendants held themselves out as real estate brokers and solicited Plaintiff to represent her in her purchase of real property.

60. Defendants intentionally failed to disclose material, important facts to Plaintiff in that Defendants failed to disclose that they were not licensed by the California Bureau of Real estate, that Sergio Chavez’s real estate license had been revoked, that Defendant Curiel’s real estate license had been suspended and that neither they nor Domile Investments, Inc. had any special expertise in buying real properties at real estate auctions, that Plaintiff’s $53,000.00 was not deposited into a trust account, and that THE BELMONT PROPERTY was being used with which to perpetrate fraud. There may be other material facts that were concealed, and upon discovery of such, Plaintiff will seek leave of court to amend this complaint to reflect such when same is ascertained.

61. Plaintiff was unaware of any of these concealed facts.