This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 02:27:21 (UTC).

Margarita Villagomez vs Oscar Villagomez, Jr

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Margarita Villagomez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Oscar Villagomez, Jr. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6675

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Other and Petitioner

Villagomez (Angulo), Margarita

Orange Cove, CA 93646

Respondents and Minors

Villagomez, Oscar

Villagomez, Johnathan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • Historical Documents- Comment: DMS Conversion Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Original Type: 1 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • Judgment Scanned FL Ret- Comment: Family Law Judgment Date: 5/19/14 Scanned Date: 8/5/14 tf 08/0514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Judgment Signed - CMC off calendar 5-19-14 cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to: 2nd floor for scanning of judgment copies returned to Box 45 cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Notice of entry of judgment- Comment: Notice of entry of judgment filed. 5-19-14 cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg- Comment: Marital status ends: 7-4-14 Wife name restrored to: Margarita Angulo 5-19-14 cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Dissolution _X__ Legal Separation ___ 5-19-14 cm Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense- Comment: Preliminary and Final 5-19-14 cm

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2014
  • Property Declaration- Comment: Community property dec ms 3/11/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • Document sent to- Comment: Default sent to Default Desk JJR 03/03/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 17-DEC-2013 by DCALABRESE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona dc 12/17/13 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Income & Expense Declaration- Comment: dc 12/17/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Uniform custody juris- Comment: Filed declaration under uniform child custody jurisdiction act. Child/ren residence for past 6 months: and period of residence: 2010 to present dc 12/17/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Summons Issued Yes __X_ assigned to Judge McGuire dc 12/17/13 Event: Pet Disso Marr w/child-No Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Order Granting Waiver of Fees- Comment: Order signed Yes __X_ dc 12/17/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. dc 12/17/13 Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less