This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/09/2018 at 01:30:08 (UTC).

Margaret Garretson vs Dianne Cazerian

Case Summary

On 12/12/2014 Margaret Garretson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dianne Cazerian. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0388

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garretson, Margaret

Defendants

Caserian, Diane

Ayala, Joe

Cazerian, Dianne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hollingsworth, David C

Law Office David Hollingsworth 4617 N. West Ave

Fresno, CA 93705

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Amended Document Filed

Civil Document; Comment: on 1st Amended Complaint **Amended the spelling of Plaintiff Dianne Cazerian's name**

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Judgment Type: Dismissal Order - Entire Action; Party Names: Garretson, Margaret; Cazerian, Dianne; Ayala, Joe; Comment: Case DWOP on 3/4/16 per minute order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:02 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • OSC - 3.740 Collection Case Dispo- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:02 AM; Result: Continued Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:02 AM; Result: Continued Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Document Filed- Civil Document; Comment: on 1st Amended Complaint **Amended the spelling of Plaintiff Dianne Cazerian's name**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:02 AM; Result: Continued Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2015
  • 60-Day Continued OSC- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 10:01 AM; Result: Continued Party's Motion; Comment: OSC set for Failure to Appear by Plaintiff and for Failure to Serve.; Parties Present- Plaintiff; Parties Present- Attorney: Hollingsworth, David C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCE350145.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. ms ***Copies placed in Tickler "H" no S.A.S.E or runner's/box tag provided***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 19-DEC-2014 by MSANCHEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed ms Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet ms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: ms Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-PI-001

SHORT TITLE: ' CASE NUMBER: