This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/09/2018 at 13:58:50 (UTC).

Marcus Thompson vs. Thalia Arenas

Case Summary

On 04/09/2015 Marcus Thompson filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Thalia Arenas. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ikeda, Dale. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0594

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ikeda, Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thompson, Marcus

Defendant

Arenas, Thalia

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Thompson, Marcus; Awarded Against:; Arenas, Thalia; Amount; Damages: $1,500.00; Costs: $115.00; Total: $1615.00

Letter Received

Letter Received; Comment: to remove OX hearing off from calendar

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe; Comment: by Deputy Clerk

Application and Order for Examination

Application and Order for Examination; Comment: Of Judgment Debtor filed.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: Request to continue court trial to perfect service.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed

Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Thompson, Marcus; Awarded Against:; Arenas, Thalia; Amount; Damages: $1,500.00; Costs: $115.00; Total: $1615.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Order of Examination- Judicial Officer: Ikeda, Dale; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter Received- Letter Received; Comment: to remove OX hearing off from calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed- Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe; Comment: by Deputy Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Application and Order for Examination- Application and Order for Examination; Comment: Of Judgment Debtor filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • Restored from Under Advisement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • Taken under advisement (Small Claims Only)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • Court Trial- Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Plaintiff: Thompson, Marcus; Parties Present- Defendant: Arenas, Thalia

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2015
  • Proof of Service-Not Served- Comment: $40.00 (Waiver - Recoverable)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 04/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed- Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Financial info for Thompson, Marcus: Fee Waiver $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Financial info for Thompson, Marcus: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Financial info for Thompson, Marcus: Fee Waiver $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Financial info for Thompson, Marcus: Transaction Assessment $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • Financial: Thompson, Marcus; Total Financial Assessment $135.00; Total Payments and Credits $135.00

    Read MoreRead Less