This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 10:27:57 (UTC).

Manuel Dias vs. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 01/17/2017 Manuel Dias filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamilton, Jeffrey Y, Dalesandro, Samuel, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0165

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y

Dalesandro, Samuel

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

Avitia, Lilia

Dias, Manuel Joseph

Dias, Harlee Ann Dupree

FCA US LLC

Chrysler Group, LLC

Liberty Chrylser Dodge Jeep

Hanford Chrysler-Dodge-Jeep, Inc.

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

Lima, Norbert Joseph

Hansford Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, a Business, form unknown

Chrysler Group, LLC a Delaware Corporation

FCA US LLC

Hanford Chrysler-Dodge-Jeep, Inc.

Liberty Chrysler Dodge Jeep

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Lima, Norbert Joseph

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Chase, Brian D

Cosgrove, Ryan E.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Allard Bernhardt, Victoria

Ebin, Robert D.

Schirm, Barry

Nguyen, Tin Brian T.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Ebin, Robert D.

Cosgrove, Ryan E.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Dismissal Hearing on May 14, 2018 at 1:00 PM in Conference Room 305

Letter Received

Letter Received; Comment: By email. Counsel makes request to take PTDC set for 10/27, off calendar

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee; Comment: to 2nd cross-complaint

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Opposition filed

1573625_984CHASEoppo; Comment: Plaintiffs opposition to Demurrer

Notice Filed

1570716_422DiasPOS1.; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Answer to Plaintiffs' Unverified First Amended Complaint for Damages

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: of CMC

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint; Comment: Complaint

Amended Document Filed

Amended Petition; Comment: Amended Petition

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: Pending Hearing

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: PENDING UNTIL HEARING Order to deposit money into blocked account

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Order on Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Notice of Jury Deposit; Comment: Jury Fee Deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of Defendant/Cross-Complainant, Norbert Joseph Lima

Reply filed

Reply; Comment: To Opposition to Demurrer to 1st Amended Complaint

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Notice Filed

1523346_8091522318NO; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Civil

Proof of Service

1492873_647BISNARpro; Comment: Chrysler Group LLC

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Dias, Manuel Joseph; Avitia, Lilia; Dias, Harlee Ann Dupree; Lima, Norbert Joseph; Hanford Chrysler-Dodge-Jeep, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice as to the remaining parties in the complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Lima, Norbert Joseph; Dias, Manuel Joseph; Chrysler Group, LLC; Hanford Chrysler-Dodge-Jeep, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice Cross-Complaint filed by Norbert Joseph Lima

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: FCA US LLC; Lima, Norbert Joseph; Comment: 2nd cross complaint - with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Order to Compromise Claim (not entire action); Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Judgment Type: Order to Compromise Claim (not entire action); Party Names: Dias, Harlee Ann Dupree; FCA US LLC; Lima, Norbert Joseph; Hanford Chrysler-Dodge-Jeep, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Hansford Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, a Business, form unknown; Comment: Withou Prejudice; Comment: (As to defendant, Hansford Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram, A Business form unknown, in the Original Complaint, ONLY.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 12-20 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • CRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • CRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2017
  • Financial info for FCA US LLC: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Financial info for FCA US LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-16108 FCA US LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Financial info for FCA US LLC: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Financial: FCA US LLC; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Financial info for Dias, Harlee Ann Dupree: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-67193 Dias, Harlee Ann Dupree $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Financial info for Dias, Harlee Ann Dupree: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Financial: Dias, Harlee Ann Dupree; Total Financial Assessment $60.00; Total Payments and Credits $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Financial info for Dias, Manuel Joseph: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-03483 DIAS, MANUEL JOSEPH $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Financial info for Dias, Manuel Joseph: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Financial: Dias, Manuel Joseph; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less