This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/03/2018 at 09:48:47 (UTC).

Manpreet Bhathal vs Charnpal Gill

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 Manpreet Bhathal filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Charnpal Gill. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gamoian, Lisa and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3162

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gamoian, Lisa

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bhathal, Manpreet Kaur

Respondent

Gill, Charnpal Singh

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Final Judgment; Party Names: Bhathal, Manpreet Kaur; Gill, Charnpal Singh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons- Comment: /CORRECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Judge Tharpe Minute Order. See attached.- Comment: HRG: 7/16/2018 Judicial Officer: D. Tharpe Dept: 202 Time: 09:31 Clerk: Mp Vang Reporter: C Hernandez Petitioner not present Respondent not present Hearing Type: OSC TRO Off calendar No appearance by either party The temporary restraining order is dissolved effective immediately.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • TRO Order to Show Cause- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Domestic Violence OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • App/Declaration - DV in Existing case w/o Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution without Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Financial info for Bhathal, Manpreet Kaur: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Financial info for Bhathal, Manpreet Kaur: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Financial: Bhathal, Manpreet Kaur; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.