This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 12:19:01 (UTC).

Main Street Acquisition Corp vs Jeffrey Bohannan

Case Summary

On 02/22/2012 Main Street Acquisition Corp filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jeffrey Bohannan. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0220

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Main Street Acquisition Corp

Defendant

Bohannan, Jeffery A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kennard, Robert Scott

 

Court Documents

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed; Comment: Jeffrey A Bohannan

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed wholly unsatisfied

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed- Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed; Comment: Jeffrey A Bohannan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed wholly unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE305133.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $8,800.86 ph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $0.00 Interest: $319.70 Costs: $55.00 ph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE295697.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2012
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 10/23/12 for plaintiff Main Street Acquisition Corp against defendant Jeffrey A Bohannan in the sum of: Principal: $6,517.12 Interest: $ 1,589.54 Atty Fees: $ 0.00 Costs: $ 294.50 Total: $8,401.16 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration RE: Computaion of Interes, Notice Pursuant to CCP 1033(b)(2) filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2012
  • Proof of service filed- Comment: Proof of service by mail filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Mrs. Bohannan, mailed on 3/20/12. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCL38080.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued. cg Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: cg Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Financial info for Main Street Acquisition Corp: Counter Payment Receipt # 38080 Main Street Acquisition Corp $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Financial info for Main Street Acquisition Corp: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Financial: Main Street Acquisition Corp; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less